Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Skandia Finanz AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.12.2000
Deletion from the commercial register
08.08.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.024.027-2
UID/VAT
CHE-101.331.003
Sector
Services for banks and credit institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist das Erbringen von Finanzdienstleistungen aller Art. Sie kann im übrigen alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens und die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszweckes zu fördern oder zu erleichtern, wie insbesondere sich an Unternehmungen ähnlicher Art im In- und Ausland zu beteiligen und Grundeigentum zu erwerben und zu veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | <2004 | 07.08.2005 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Skandia Finance Ltd in liq
- Skandia Finance SA en liq
- Skandia Bank Switzerland AG
- Skandia Finanz AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Skandia Finanz AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2965410, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Skandia Finanz AG in Liquidation, in Zürich, CH-020.3.024.027-2, Finanzdienstleistungen, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 03.02.2004, S. 21, Publ. 2100002). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht .
Publication number: 2100002, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 13 vom 21.01.2004, S. 18, publizierten TB-Eintrags Nr. 1664 vom 15.01.2004. Skandia Finanz AG in Liquidation, in Zürich, Finanzdienstleistungen, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 13 vom 21.01.2004, S. 18, Publ. 2081834).
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Skandia Finance Ltd in liquidation) (Skandia Finance SA en liquidation).
Publication number: 2081834, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Skandia Finanz AG, in Zürich, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 19.12.2003, S. 28, Publ. 2039244).
Firma neu:
Skandia Finanz AG in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Skandia Finanz Ltd in liquidation) (Skandia Finanz SA en liquidation). Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 12.01.2004 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Göransson, Mats, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lundsten, Göran B., schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Täby (S), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rechsteiner, Leo, von Appenzell, in Reinach AG, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gschwend, Bruno, von Zürich, in Winterthur, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Simola, Alessandro, von Vilters-Wangs, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Skarin, Ulf, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wolf, Michael, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Saltsjöbaden (SE), Präsident und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident];
Tönz, Leonhard, von Vals, in Niederweningen, Vizepräsident und Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident];
Bigler-Heiniger, Renate, von Basel, Eriswil und Worb, in Walchwil, Mitglied und Liquidatorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied].