Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Address
Route de la Communance 86
2800 Delémont
Reports for Simon et Membrez S.A.
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.04.1975
Deletion from the commercial register
31.05.2022
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Delémont
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-670.3.000.517-3
UID/VAT
CHE-102.148.884
Sector
Manufacturing of measurement and control instruments
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrication complète de la boîte de montre en tous matériaux, ainsi que distribution de sa production et commerce de tous produits se rapportant d'une manière directe ou indirecte à la boîte de montre
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Neuchâtel | 13.09.2012 | 30.05.2022 | |
BfB Société Fiduciaire Bourquin Frères et Béran SA, succursale de Fribourg | Fribourg | <2004 | 12.09.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
SIMON ET MEMBREZ | 24.01.2019 | active | 74585/2018 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Simon et Membrez S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1005485742, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Simon et Membrez S.A., à Delémont, CHE-102.148.884, société anonyme (No. FOSC 240 du 09.12.2021, Publ. 1005353867). Les actifs et les passifs envers les tiers sont repris par la société "Blancpain SA", à Le Chenit (CHE-105.912.297). La société est radiée par suite de fusion.
Publication number: HR02-1005353867, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Simon et Membrez S.A., à Delémont, CHE-102.148.884, société anonyme (No. FOSC 222 du 15.11.2021, Publ. 1005334519).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Schmid, Philippe Henri, de Waltalingen, à Delémont, vice-directeur, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005334519, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Simon et Membrez S.A., à Delémont, CHE-102.148.884, société anonyme (No. FOSC 137 du 19.07.2021, Publ. 1005252995).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Haering, Yann Maurice, de Aesch BL, à Vicques, vice-directeur, avec signature collective à deux.