Reports for PROVINS SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout PROVINS SA
- PROVINS SA has its legal headquarters in Sion, is active and operates in the sector «Beverage production (with alcohol)».
- PROVINS SA has 11 persons entered in its management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 08.03.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company PROVINS SA is registered under the UID CHE-106.624.352.
- View all information about the 88 trademarks registered by the company PROVINS SA.
- Cave de l'Atelier Sàrl, Cave de producteurs de vins du Valais Sàrl, Cave St-Léonard SA Sierre have the same address as PROVINS SA.
Management (11)
newest board members
Geneviève Anne-Marie Gassmann-Andrey,
Christian Reto Consoni,
Pierre Dorsaz,
Andreas Bär,
Jean Blaise Raymond Gollut
newest authorized signatories
François Paul Messer,
Raphaël Marquis,
Evelyn Boedts-Freitag,
Nick Lionnel Crettenand,
Geneviève Anne-Marie Gassmann-Andrey
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.08.1930
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.5.001.240-0
UID/VAT
CHE-106.624.352
Sector
Beverage production (with alcohol)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La production et le commerce de produits alimentaires, notamment viticoles et vinicoles, l'achat, la vinification, le conditionnement, le stockage et la vente, ainsi que l'amélioration de la viticulture et de l¿œnologie (cf. statuts pour but complet)
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO SA | Sion | 23.06.2021 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA | Martigny | 13.02.2015 | 22.06.2021 | |
Ernst & Young SA | Lausanne | 04.08.2006 | 12.02.2015 | |
ECSA Fiduciaire SA | Sion | <2004 | 03.08.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- PROVINS AG
- PROVINS Ltd.
- PROVINS société coopérative
- PROVINS
- 'Provins' Fédération des Caves de producteurs de vins du Valais F.C.P.V.V.
- Provins Fédération des caves de producteurs de vins du Valais F.C.P.V.V.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
GRAND METRAL | - | pending application | 08863/2023 |
MAITRE DE CHAIS | - | pending application | 08867/2023 |
Newest SOGC notifications: PROVINS SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005981628, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
PROVINS SA, à Sion, CHE-106.624.352, société anonyme (No. FOSC 100 du 25.05.2023, Publ. 1005754187).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Vonlanthen, Kevin, de Tafers, à Siviriez, directeur, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Messer, François Paul, de Fraubrunnen, à Blonay - Saint-Légier, directeur, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005754187, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
PROVINS SA, à Sion, CHE-106.624.352, société anonyme (No. FOSC 219 du 10.11.2021, Publ. 1005331209).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Bender, Florence, de Fully, à Martigny, directrice, avec signature collective à deux;
Dupertuis-dit-Neveu, Grégoire, de Ormont-Dessous, à Savièse, directeur, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Marquis, Raphaël, de Liddes, à Vernayaz, directeur, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005331209, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
PROVINS SA, à Sion, CHE-106.624.352, société anonyme (No. FOSC 119 du 23.06.2021, Publ. 1005226465).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Boedts-Freitag, Evelyn, de Stein (AG), à Gals, directrice, avec signature collective à deux;
Crettenand, Nick Lionnel, de Riddes, à Sion, directeur, avec signature collective à deux;
Vonlanthen, Kevin, de Tafers, à Siviriez, directeur, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.