Reports for Natura Strom GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Natura Strom GmbH
- Natura Strom GmbH has its legal headquarters in Therwil, is active and operates in the sector «Electrical power production and utilities».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 11.07.2007.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 15.01.2018.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Natura Strom GmbH is the following: CHE-113.728.063.
- The address is identical with 3 other active companies. These include: CEEBA GmbH, Green Electric GmbH, H.B. Kleintransporte & Handel GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.07.2007
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Therwil
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-400.4.028.948-7
UID/VAT
CHE-113.728.063
Sector
Electrical power production and utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erzeugung und den Verkauf von Wärme und elektrischem Strom sowie den Import und Export von landwirtschaftlichen Produkten aller Art. Ebenfalls kann die Gesellschaft Handel mit Waren aller Art betreiben. Sie kann vor allem Fahrzeuge, Motoren, Maschinen und Geräte aller Art an- und verkaufen sowie instand setzen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Natura Strom GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3989149, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Natura Strom GmbH, bisher in Ramsen, CHE-113.728.063, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 57 vom 24.03.2015, Publ. 2058963).
Statutenänderung:
14.12.2017.
Sitz neu:
Therwil.
Domizil neu:
Witterswilerfeldweg 9, 4106 Therwil.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Krieger, Felix, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Therwil, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 12'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Minder, Roland, von Bottmingen, Biel/Bienne und Huttwil, in Basel, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 8'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 12'000.00 [bisher: von Bottmingen und Biel/Bienne, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 8'000.00].
Publication number: 3989201, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Natura Strom GmbH, in Ramsen, CHE-113.728.063, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 57 vom 24.03.2015, Publ. 2058963). Die Gesellschaft wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Therwil im Handelsregister des Kantons Schaffhausen von Amtes wegen gelöscht und im Handelsregister des Kantons Basel-Landschaft eingetragen.
Publication number: 2058963, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Natura Strom GmbH, in Ramsen, CHE-113.728.063, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 15.02.2013, Publ. 7066860).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mohr, Marco, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Aach (DE), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Minder, Roland, von Bottmingen und Biel/Bienne, in Basel, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 8'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.