Reports for MTCH AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout MTCH AG
- MTCH AG has its legal headquarters in Glattbrugg, is active and operates in the sector «Travel agency and tour operator services».
- The company was founded on 17.02.1993.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 12.03.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-103.628.247.
- The IPI database currently contains 2 trademarks or applications for the company MTCH AG.
- The address is identical with 17 other active companies. These include: Dr. Falk Pharma AG, Gate Gourmet GmbH, Gate Gourmet Switzerland GmbH.
Management (30)
newest board members
Anja Keckeisen,
Michel Gruber,
Mario Irminger,
Isabelle Zimmermann,
Stefan Roland Leser
newest authorized signatories
Eckhardt Uwe Repp,
Michel Gruber,
Mario Irminger,
Daniel Pascal Stähli,
Roland Birchmeier
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.02.1993
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Opfikon
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.003.464-0
UID/VAT
CHE-103.628.247
Sector
Travel agency and tour operator services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist der Erwerb und die dauernde Verwaltung von Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmungen sowie die Erbringung von Konzerndienstleistungen für die Hotelplan-Gruppe, insbesondere in den Bereichen Finanzen, Marketing, Rechnungslegung und -führung, Controlling, Informatik, Recht und Steuern sowie Personalwesen. Die Gesellschaft umfasst ausserdem die Führung mehrerer Reisebüros sowie die Organisation, Durchführung sowie Vermittlung von Reisen und damit zusammenhängenden touristischen Dienstleistungen aller Art im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Tochtergesellschaften und Zweigniederlassungen errichten und sich im In- und Ausland an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 05.07.2022 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | 14.05.2007 | 04.07.2022 | |
KPMG AG | Zürich | <2004 | 13.05.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- MTCH SA
- MTCH Ltd
- Travelhouse Management AG
- RBM Management & Services AG
- RBM Reisebaumeister AG
- Prima Reisen AG
- RBM Reisebaumeister AG.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
- | pending application | 12744/2024 | |
21.11.2014 | active | 58145/2014 |
Newest SOGC notifications: MTCH AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005982945, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
MTCH AG, in Opfikon, CHE-103.628.247, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 200 vom 16.10.2023, Publ. 1005860921).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wagner, Daniela, von Rorbas, in Opfikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005860921, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
MTCH AG, in Opfikon, CHE-103.628.247, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 152 vom 09.08.2023, Publ. 1005812618).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stirnimann, Thomas, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Bachmann, Tim, von Zürich, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kalt, Heinrich, von Leuggern, in Brugg, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keckeisen, Anja, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Berg (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Repp, Eckhardt Uwe, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Koppigen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005812618, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
MTCH AG, in Opfikon, CHE-103.628.247, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 83 vom 01.05.2023, Publ. 1005735299).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zumbrunnen, Fabrice, von Aeschi bei Spiez, in La Chaux-de-Fonds, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gruber, Michel, von St. Niklaus, in Luzern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Irminger, Mario, von Wildhaus-Alt St. Johann, in Oberrieden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Glesti, Markus Philip, von Wagenhausen, in Mönchaltorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Zürich];
Birchmeier, Roland, von Würenlingen, in Baden, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Stähli, Daniel Pascal, von Maschwanden, in Neunkirch, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Wanner, Thomas, von Basel, in Birsfelden, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.