Reports for Les Ateliers de la Côte (LAC) SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Les Ateliers de la Côte (LAC) SA
- Les Ateliers de la Côte (LAC) SA has its legal headquarters in Etoy and is active. It operates in the sector «Other services: entertainment and recreation».
- Les Ateliers de la Côte (LAC) SA was founded on 04.07.2000.
- On the 07.07.2020 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register VD under the UID CHE-105.599.556.
- There are 10 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Association Arts d'Essence, Atelier Complice, Rouge, Gimmemusic Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.07.2000
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Etoy
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.008.851-5
UID/VAT
CHE-105.599.556
Sector
Other services: entertainment and recreation
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La gestion et le développement d'un centre d'activités culturelles, artistiques et artisanales; la promotion d'évènements culturels; la location de salles, notamment pour des spectacles et séminaires (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Organisation fiscale et comptable Ofisco Sàrl, en liquidation | Morges | 29.05.2009 | 28.11.2019 | |
FTC Immo SA | Montreux | <2004 | 28.05.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Fruits du Roi SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
Les Ateliers de la Côte - LAC | 15.06.2016 | active | 66178/2015 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Les Ateliers de la Côte (LAC) SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004931119, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Les Ateliers de la Côte (LAC) SA, à Etoy, CHE-105.599.556 (FOSC du 29.11.2019, p. 0/1004771528). Selon déclaration du 5 mars 2020, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Publication number: HR02-1004771528, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Les Ateliers de la Côte (LAC) SA, à Etoy, CHE-105.599.556 (FOSC du 06.02.2017, p. 0/3329455). Organisation fiscale et comptable Ofisco S.à r.l. (CH-550-0168960-1) n'est plus organe de révision.
Publication number: 3329455, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Fruits du Roi S.A., à Etoy, CHE-105.599.556 (FOSC du 30.06.2015, p. 0/2238853). Statuts modifiés le 24 janvier 2017.
Nouvelle raison de commerce:
Les Ateliers de la Côte (LAC) SA.
Nouvelle adresse:
route de Pallatex 5, 1163 Etoy.
Nouveau but:
la société a pour but: la gestion et le développement d'un centre d'activités culturelles, artistiques et artisanales;
la promotion d'évènements culturels;
la location de salles, notamment pour des spectacles et séminaires (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel. Thury Jaques-François, dont la signature est radiée, et Besse François, inscrit sans signature, ne sont plus administrateurs. Schneiter Anne Catherine, maintenant à Etoy, est nommée présidente. Thury François est maintenant à Buchillon. La disposition statutaire relative à la reprise de biens est abrogée, conformément à l'article 628 al. 4 CO.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.