Reports for Caligyr AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Caligyr AG
- Caligyr AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Cham. Caligyr AG belongs to the industry «Repair and installation of machines and equipment» and is currently active.
- Caligyr AG has 8 persons entered in its management.
- On the 26.08.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Caligyr AG is registered in the Canton of ZG under the UID CHE-113.834.156.
- There are 2 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Landis+Gyr AG, Landis+Gyr Group AG.
Management (8)
newest board members
Martin Reinacher,
Jens Kordetzky,
Elodie Marina Marie-Gabrielle Carr-Cingari,
Werner Lieberherr
newest authorized signatories
Martin Reinacher,
Hao Wang Huang,
Kassra Carlo Palenzona,
Marc Alexander Zoutman,
Jens Kordetzky
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.09.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Cham
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.031.253-2
UID/VAT
CHE-113.834.156
CHE-116.285.263 VAT
Sector
Repair and installation of machines and equipment
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Zweck der Gesellschaft besteht in der Erbringung von Dienst- und Serviceleistungen im Zusammenhang mit messtechnischen Geräten für Energie und deren Zusatzgeräte sowie der Verwaltung und Abwicklung von Kundenbeziehungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und/oder finanzieren sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern. Sie kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben sowie Garantien zugunsten von verbundenen Unternehmen stellen. Diese Tätigkeiten können insbesondere auch die Einräumung von Darlehen, Aufnahme von Finanzschulden und Bereitstellung von Sicherheiten umfassen. Die Gesellschaft kann auch immaterielle Schutzrechte, wie beispielsweise Rechte an Marken und Patenten, erwerben, halten, verkaufen und kommerziell verwerten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte AG | Zürich | 02.10.2007 | 04.05.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Landis+Gyr Project AG
- Landis+Gyr AG
- Landis+Gyr Investments AG
- Swistec Schweiz AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Caligyr AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006113928, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Caligyr AG, in Cham, CHE-113.834.156, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 57 vom 21.03.2024, Publ. 1005991261).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Koller, Peter Georg, von Gersau, in Gersau, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Reinacher, Martin, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005991261, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Caligyr AG, in Cham, CHE-113.834.156, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 29 vom 12.02.2024, Publ. 1005958474).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Thürig, Andreas Walter, von Schwarzenberg, in Zug, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Birolini, Matteo Giuseppe, von Lugano, in Uetikon am See, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Frey, Pascal, von Pully, in Zürich, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Palenzona, Kassra Carlo, von Murgenthal, in Zürich, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wang, Hao, französische Staatsangehörige, in Dübendorf, Zeichnungsberechtigte, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005958474, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Caligyr AG, in Cham, CHE-113.834.156, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 213 vom 02.11.2023, Publ. 1005875060).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Koller, Peter Georg, von Gersau, in Gersau, Zeichnungsberechtigter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: deutscher Staatsangehöriger].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.