Reports for Krebsliga Zürich Begegnungszentren GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Krebsliga Zürich Begegnungszentren GmbH
- Krebsliga Zürich Begegnungszentren GmbH has its legal headquarters in Zürich and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations».
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 15.09.2023.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-310.043.797.
- On the same address as Krebsliga Zürich Begegnungszentren GmbH there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: Gesundheitspraxis ACZ Ana Caculovic, Gesundheitszentrum Hottingen AG, Krebsliga des Kantons Zürich.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.12.2011
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.046.467-8
UID/VAT
CHE-310.043.797
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Führung von Informations- und Begegnungszentren für krebsbetroffene Menschen, deren Angehörige und ein weiteres interessiertes Publikum. Die Gesellschaft verfolgt keine kommerziellen Zwecke und erstrebt keinen Gewinn. Die Gesellschaft kann Immobilien erwerben, verwalten und verkaufen. Sie kann alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG | Zürich | 22.12.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Krebsliga Zürich Turmhaus GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Krebsliga Zürich Begegnungszentren GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005838676, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Krebsliga Zürich Begegnungszentren GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-310.043.797, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 220 vom 11.11.2021, Publ. 1005331491).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Widmer, Werner, von Gränichen, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Girsberger Hofer, Esther, von Zürich, in Zürich, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005331491, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Krebsliga Zürich Begegnungszentren GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-310.043.797, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 152 vom 09.08.2021, Publ. 1005266737).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Girgis-Musy, Gisela, von Ecublens VD, in Horgen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, .
Publication number: HR02-1005266737, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Krebsliga Zürich Turmhaus GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-310.043.797, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 69 vom 08.04.2020, Publ. 1004868013).
Statutenänderung:
18.06.2021.
Firma neu:
Krebsliga Zürich Begegnungszentren GmbH.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Führung von Informations- und Begegnungszentren für krebsbetroffene Menschen, deren Angehörige und ein weiteres interessiertes Publikum. Die Gesellschaft verfolgt keine kommerziellen Zwecke und erstrebt keinen Gewinn. Die Gesellschaft kann Immobilien erwerben, verwalten und verkaufen. Sie kann alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Huck, Rolf, von Basel, in Ettingen, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, .
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bazzani, Andrea, von Buchrain, in Zürich, Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.