Reports for Kilcher Transporte AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kilcher Transporte AG
- Kilcher Transporte AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Utzenstorf. Kilcher Transporte AG belongs to the industry «Transportation of passenger and freight by road» and is currently active.
- There are 6 active persons registered in the management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 12.09.2023.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-107.194.549.
Management (6)
newest board members
Jonas Friedrich Lauter,
Lyla Khan,
Reto Silvio Sopranetti,
Roger Peter Reinhard
newest authorized signatories
Daniel Rau,
Jonas Friedrich Lauter,
Daniel Schrepfer,
Lyla Khan,
Reto Silvio Sopranetti
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.08.1990
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Utzenstorf
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.006.656-6
UID/VAT
CHE-107.194.549
Sector
Transportation of passenger and freight by road
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist die Erbringung von Transport- und Entsorgungsdienstleistungen aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Tochtergesellschaften und Zweigniederlassungen errichten und sich im In- und Ausland an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann auch alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft ist befugt, Finanzierungs-, Sanierungs-, und Interzessionsmassnahmen zu Gunsten von Aktionären, Konzerngesellschaften oder Dritten vorzunehmen, sowie Aktionären, Konzerngesellschaften oder Dritten Darlehen oder für deren Verpflichtungen Sicherheiten zu gewähren.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Bern | 01.07.2022 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Solothurn | 17.02.2021 | 30.06.2022 | |
Walter Brönnimann Treuhand AG | Burgdorf | 01.11.2012 | 16.02.2021 | |
Treuhandbüro Walter Brönnimann | Burgdorf | <2004 | 31.10.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kilcher Transporte AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005835913, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kilcher Transporte AG, in Utzenstorf, CHE-107.194.549, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 72 vom 14.04.2023, Publ. 1005723682).
Statutenänderung:
31.08.2023.
Zweck neu:
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist die Erbringung von Transport- und Entsorgungsdienstleistungen aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Tochtergesellschaften und Zweigniederlassungen errichten und sich im In- und Ausland an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann auch alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft ist befugt, Finanzierungs-, Sanierungs-, und Interzessionsmassnahmen zu Gunsten von Aktionären, Konzerngesellschaften oder Dritten vorzunehmen, sowie Aktionären, Konzerngesellschaften oder Dritten Darlehen oder für deren Verpflichtungen Sicherheiten zu gewähren.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre: schriftlich per Brief, E-Mail oder Fax oder Publikation im SHAB.
Publication number: HR02-1005723682, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kilcher Transporte AG, in Utzenstorf, CHE-107.194.549, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 63 vom 30.03.2023, Publ. 1005712910).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Roder, Patrick, von Wengi, in Detligen (Radelfingen), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rau, Daniel, von Aadorf, in Grafenried (Fraubrunnen), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005712910, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Kilcher Transporte AG, in Utzenstorf, CHE-107.194.549, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 3 vom 05.01.2023, Publ. 1005644222).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Frefel, Jürg Ernst, von Schönholzerswilen, in Münchenbuchsee, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lauter, Jonas, von Muri bei Bern, in Muri b. Bern (Muri bei Bern), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.