Reports for Karl Krebs Kirchdorf AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Karl Krebs Kirchdorf AG
- Karl Krebs Kirchdorf AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Kirchdorf BE. Karl Krebs Kirchdorf AG belongs to the industry «Other construction» and is currently active.
- The management of the company Karl Krebs Kirchdorf AG, which was founded on the 20.03.1995, consists of 2 persons.
- On the 14.01.2020 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-107.916.314.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.03.1995
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kirchdorf (BE)
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.011.128-0
UID/VAT
CHE-107.916.314
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausführen von Spenglerarbeiten aller Art sowie Installation von Blitzschutzanlagen, Heizungen, sanitären Anlagen und Solaranlagen; die Gesellschaft kann sich an andern Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Grundstücke erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Schönenberger Die Treuhänder AG | Muri bei Bern | 20.09.2011 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Effida Treuhand und Revisionen AG | Mellingen | <2004 | 19.09.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Krebs Karl Kirchdorf AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Karl Krebs Kirchdorf AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004803650, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Karl Krebs Kirchdorf AG, in Kirchdorf (BE), CHE-107.916.314, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 193 vom 05.10.2016, Publ. 3090217).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Krebs, Karl, von Kirchdorf BE, in Kirchdorf BE, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Krebs-Hunziker, Gertrud, von Kirchdorf BE, in Kirchdorf BE, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Krebs, Urs, von Kirchdorf (BE), in Kirchdorf BE, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Krebs, Gabriela, von Uesslingen-Buch, in Kirchdorf BE, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3090217, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Karl Krebs Kirchdorf AG, in Kirchdorf (BE), CHE-107.916.314, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 181 vom 18.09.2015, Publ. 2379915).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schönenberger Die Treuhänder AG (CHE-106.001.257), in Muri b. Bern (Muri bei Bern), Revisionsstelle [bisher: BGT SCHÖNENBERGER GROLIMUND AG].
Publication number: 2379915, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Karl Krebs Kirchdorf AG, in Kirchdorf BE, CHE-107.916.314, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 152 vom 09.08.2013, Publ. 1021587).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
BGT SCHÖNENBERGER GROLIMUND AG (CHE-106.001.257), in Muri bei Bern, Revisionsstelle [bisher: BGT SCHÖNENBERGER GROLIMUND AG (CH-035.3.011.392-9)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.