Reports for Julander Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Julander Holding AG
- Julander Holding AG from Bottighofen operates in the sector «Services regarding management consulting» and is active.
- The management of the company Julander Holding AG consists of one person.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 15.07.2022. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company Julander Holding AG is registered under the UID CHE-199.713.753.
- On the same address as Julander Holding AG there are 26 other active companies registered. These include: altrimo ag, Amagvi Zweite AG, Baukubatur AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.01.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bottighofen
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.079.321-0
UID/VAT
CHE-199.713.753
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Anbieten von Dienstleistungen in der Unternehmensberatung, im Marketing und PR. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum und Immobilien eerwerben, belasten, veräussern, halten, vermitteln und vewalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien ud Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Kelmendi & Sen AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Julander Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005522214, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Julander Holding AG, in Bottighofen, CHE-199.713.753, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 175 vom 09.09.2020, Publ. 1004975328).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Locher, Daniel, von Domat/Ems, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Knup, Walter, von Hefenhofen, in Müllheim Dorf (Müllheim), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004975229, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Kelmendi & Sen AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-199.713.753, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 02.02.2016, S.0, Publ. 2633317). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Bottighofen im Handelsregister des Kantons Thurgau unter der neuen Firma Julander Holding AG eingetragen und im Handelsregister Kanton St. Gallen von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1004975328, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Kelmendi & Sen AG, bisher in St. Gallen, CHE-199.713.753, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 02.02.2016, Publ. 2633317).
Statutenänderung:
03.09.2020.
Firma neu:
Julander Holding AG.
Sitz neu:
Bottighofen.
Domizil neu:
Hauptstrasse 34, 8598 Bottighofen.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Anbieten von Dienstleistungen in der Unternehmensberatung, im Marketing und PR. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum und Immobilien eerwerben, belasten, veräussern, halten, vermitteln und vewalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien ud Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sen, Marco, von Wald AR, in Heiden, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Kelmendi, Qendrim, von Heiden, in Heiden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Locher, Daniel, von Domat/Ems, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.