Branches (1)
Reports for EFEC SCHWEIZ AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout EFEC SCHWEIZ AG
- EFEC SCHWEIZ AG in Safenwil is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Car dealership». EFEC SCHWEIZ AG is active.
- The company was founded on 19.04.1995 and has 5 persons in its management.
- On the 21.02.2022 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-101.641.159.
- BY Cars AG, Docar AG, Emil Frey AG have the same address as EFEC SCHWEIZ AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Marcel Guerry,
Markus Stutz,
Roger Huber,
Gerhard Schürmann,
Walter Frey
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.04.1995
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Safenwil
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.016.540-8
UID/VAT
CHE-101.641.159
Sector
Car dealership
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Import und Export von sowie Handel mit Motorfahrzeugen, Ersatzteilen und Zubehör für Fahrzeuge; kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen sowie Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | 19.11.1999 | 20.02.2022 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- EFEC SWITZERLAND LTD
- EFEC SUISSE SA
- JAGUAR LAND ROVER SCHWEIZ AG
- JAGUAR LAND ROVER SWITZERLAND LTD
- JAGUAR LAND ROVER SUISSE SA
- Jaguar Schweiz AG
- T G Service AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: EFEC SCHWEIZ AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005410563, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
EFEC SCHWEIZ AG, in Safenwil, CHE-101.641.159, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 01.06.2021, Publ. 1005200815). Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 01.02.2022 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-106.839.438), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005200815, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
EFEC SCHWEIZ AG, in Safenwil, CHE-101.641.159, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 9 vom 14.01.2021, Publ. 1005073902).
Vermögensübertragung:
Die Gesellschaft überträgt gemäss Vertrag vom 15.04.2021 Aktiven von CHF 31'831'958.92 und Passiven von CHF 48'946.00 (Fremdkapital) auf die JAGUAR LAND ROVER SCHWEIZ AG, in Safenwil (CHE-366.200.471). Gegenleistung CHF 31'831'958.92.
Publication number: HR02-1005073902, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
EFEC SCHWEIZ AG, in Safenwil, CHE-101.641.159, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 252 vom 28.12.2020, Publ. 1005059789).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kolchanov, Dmitry, russischer Staatsangehöriger, in Oxford (GB), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
McFall, Finbar Oliver, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Leamington Spa (GB), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Donnellan, Damian, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Hausen am Albis, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Füllhase, Harald, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Lauchringen (DE), Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Graf von Saurma-Jeltsch, Marius, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Erlenbach (ZH), Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Held, Karin, von Gelterkinden, in Urtenen-Schönbühl, Direktorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Plüss, Hans Peter, von Brittnau, in Möriken-Wildegg, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Tinguely, Michel, von La Roche, in Farvagny, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Dreier, René H., von Trub, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stössel, Werner, von Bäretswil, in Regensdorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bosshard, Patrick, von Zürich, in Roggwil (BE), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Müller, Jacqueline, von Rohrbach, in Vordemwald, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.