Branches (1)
Reports for GPI Swiss AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout GPI Swiss AG
- GPI Swiss AG with its legal headquarters in St. Gallen is active. GPI Swiss AG operates in the sector «Production and processing of paper and carboard goods».
- The management consists of 6 persons. The company was founded on 05.03.1983.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 14.12.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of SG is CHE-102.316.503.
- There are 22 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Beck & Co. AG, Bijou Brigitte GmbH, Bleichenbacher + Steiger Treuhand AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Hilde Van Moeseke,
Joseph Paul Yost,
Silvia Oertle,
René Koller,
Velibor Dragosav
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.03.1983
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.005.621-0
UID/VAT
CHE-102.316.503
Sector
Production and processing of paper and carboard goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung, Herstellung und den Vertrieb von bedruckten Verkaufsverpackungen aus Karton und Papier und das Erbringen von damit zusammenhängenden Leistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann ferner im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, halten, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Die Gesellschaft kann Patente, Marken, Lizenzen und Herstellungsverfahren und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, entwickeln, anmelden oder diese verwerten oder veräussern. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Basel | 28.09.2022 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | St. Gallen | 21.04.2020 | 27.09.2022 | |
PROVIDA Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | St. Gallen | 30.06.2006 | 20.04.2020 | |
Ernst & Young AG | St. Gallen | <2004 | 29.06.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- GPI Swiss SA
- GPI Swiss Ltd
- AR Packaging Swiss SA
- AR Packaging Swiss Ltd
- AR Packaging Swiss AG
- K+D AG
- K + D AG Karton + Design
- K + D Kartonage + Druck AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: GPI Swiss AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005628162, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
GPI Swiss AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-102.316.503, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 231 vom 28.11.2022, Publ. 1005614204).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Willner, Lars, schwedischer Staatsangehöriger, in Limhamn (SE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Van Moeseke, Hilde, belgische Staatsangehörige, in Reet (BE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005614204, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
GPI Swiss AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-102.316.503, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 188 vom 28.09.2022, Publ. 1005570855).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schulz, Harald, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Biblis (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Yost, Joseph Paul, amerikanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Ixelles (BE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005570855, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
AR Packaging Swiss AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-102.316.503, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 177 vom 13.09.2022, Publ. 1005560605).
Statutenänderung:
21.09.2022.
Firma neu:
GPI Swiss AG.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(GPI Swiss Ltd) (GPI Swiss SA).
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief an die im Aktienbuch registrierten Adressen oder per E-Mail. [Anpassung aufgrund geänderter Eintragungspraxis].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
KPMG AG (CHE-255.496.640), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kassel, Ivo, von Appenzell, in Mörschwil, Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in St. Gallen];
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-393.441.652), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.