Address
c/o Roland Goetschmann
Wallstrasse 21
4500 Solothurn
Reports for Stiftung Oberbalmberg
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Oberbalmberg
- Stiftung Oberbalmberg with its legal headquarters in Solothurn is a Foundation from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». Stiftung Oberbalmberg is active.
- Stiftung Oberbalmberg was founded on 01.01.1920.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 27.08.2020.
- The organization Stiftung Oberbalmberg is registered under the UID CHE-110.383.097.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Andrea Margrit Arrigoni,
Gerhard Flück,
Bernhard Meier,
Tanja Badertscher,
Roland Goetschmann
newest authorized signatories
Andrea Margrit Arrigoni,
Gerhard Flück,
Bernhard Meier,
Tanja Badertscher,
Roland Goetschmann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.01.1920
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Solothurn
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-260.7.000.073-6
UID/VAT
CHE-110.383.097
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Gewährung von Beiträgen an Kuren für Pflegebdürftige jeden Alters.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bargetzi Revisions AG | Solothurn | 06.04.2017 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bargetzi Treuhand | Solothurn | 15.06.2016 | 05.04.2017 | |
Treucon Felder | Egerkingen | 23.05.2007 | 14.06.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Oberbalmberg
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004966008, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Stiftung Oberbalmberg, in Solothurn, CHE-110.383.097, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 24.07.2018, Publ. 4377853).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Erika, von Ermensee, in Dulliken, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Arrigoni, Andrea Margrit, von Bellinzona, in Recherswil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates und Rechnungsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4377853, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Stiftung Oberbalmberg, in Solothurn, CHE-110.383.097, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 68 vom 06.04.2017, Publ. 3450095).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Stiftungsaufsicht Solothurn, in Solothurn.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ritter, Erich, von Trachselwald, in Pratteln, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Flück, Gerhard, von Günsberg, in Riedholz, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Meier, Bernhard, von Deitingen, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3450095, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Stiftung Oberbalmberg, in Solothurn, CHE-110.383.097, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 26.09.2016, Publ. 3073395).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bargetzi Treuhand (CHE-106.761.411), in Solothurn, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bargetzi Revisions AG (CHE-327.817.018), in Solothurn, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.