Address
c/o Lic. iur. Roger Ulrich, Zgraggen Ulrich & Partner
Pilatusstrasse 58
6003 Luzern
Reports for Stiftung für die Erhaltung der Museggmauer
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung für die Erhaltung der Museggmauer
- Stiftung für die Erhaltung der Museggmauer is currently active and the industry «Religious, political or secular associations». The legal headquarters are in Luzern.
- There are 6 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 28.01.2016.
- Stiftung für die Erhaltung der Museggmauer is registered in the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-110.312.163.
- There are 5 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: BASERU Consult AG, BASERU Immo AG, Free Power Media GmbH.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Roger Ulrich,
Beat Arthur Lötscher,
Ernst Widmer,
René Schmalz,
Adrian Karl Martin Borgula
newest authorized signatories
Roger Ulrich,
Beat Arthur Lötscher,
Ernst Widmer,
René Schmalz,
Adrian Karl Martin Borgula
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.11.2003
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.7.027.515-5
UID/VAT
CHE-110.312.163
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erhaltung, Attraktivierung und Revitalisierung der Museggmauer samt ihrer Türme als mittelalterliches Baudenkmal von nationaler Bedeutung und identitätsstiftendes Wahrzeichen der Stadt Luzern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Balmer-Etienne AG | Luzern | 07.06.2006 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung für die Erhaltung der Museggmauer
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2625177, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Stiftung für die Erhaltung der Museggmauer, in Luzern, CHE-110.312.163, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 107 vom 06.06.2013, Publ. 7218124).
Domizil neu:
c/o Lic. iur. Roger Ulrich, Zgraggen Ulrich & Partner, Pilatusstrasse 58, 6003 Luzern.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ineichen, Dr. Thomas, von Luzern und Emmen, in Luzern, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Haas, Helen, von Luzern und Sursee, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wyss, Otto, von Meggen und Fulenbach, in Meggen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fischer, Beat, von Gettnau und Triengen, in Sempach, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Heini, Hans Peter, von Weggis und Ruswil, in Weggis, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lötscher, Beat, von Luzern, in Meggen, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ulrich, Lic. iur. Roger, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schmalz, René, von Nidau, in Kriens, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Widmer, Ernst, von Emmen, in Emmen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Balmer-Etienne AG (CHE-107.252.508), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Balmer-Etienne AG, in Luzern (CH-100.3.004.354-1)].
Publication number: 7218124, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Stiftung für die Erhaltung der Museggmauer, in Luzern, CH-100.7.027.515-5, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 100 vom 27.05.2010, S. 11, Publ. 5648918).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Roth, Stefan, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Borgula, Adrian, von Zürich, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 5648918, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Stiftung für die Erhaltung der Museggmauer, in Luzern, CH-100.7.027.515-5, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 184 vom 23.09.2008, S. 10, Publ. 4662352).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Müller, Dr. Franz, von Sursee und Knutwil, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Burri, Dr. phil. Hans-Rudolf, von Malters und Luzern, in Eich, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Heini, Hans Peter, von Weggis und Ruswil, in Weggis, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Roth, Stefan, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.