Address
c/o Gesellschaft zum Kämbel in der Haue
Limmatquai 52
8001 Zürich
Reports for Stiftung des Kiwanis-Clubs Zürich
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung des Kiwanis-Clubs Zürich
- Stiftung des Kiwanis-Clubs Zürich in Zürich is a Foundation from the sector «Other social services». Stiftung des Kiwanis-Clubs Zürich is active.
- The management consists of 6 persons. The organization was founded on 31.01.1976.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 25.04.2022, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-110.305.045.
- The address is identical with 4 other active companies. These include: Fritz Schneiter, Gesellschaft zum Kämbel in der Haue, Genossenschaft, Restaurant zur Haue AG.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Dr. Thomas David Albert Massabni,
Sinan Cem Odok,
Beat Gontersweiler,
Urs Alfred Jucker
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Thomas David Albert Massabni,
Sinan Cem Odok,
Beat Gontersweiler,
Robert Ernst Gubler,
Urs Alfred Jucker
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.01.1976
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.904.310-7
UID/VAT
CHE-110.305.045
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt im Sinne der Jugendhilfe, der Altersfürsorge sowie der Unterstützung kultureller Bestrebungen die Gewährung von Beiträgen an Einzelpersonen, Institutionen oder Gemeinden zur gezielten Hilfe.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Aeberli Treuhand AG | Zürich | 25.04.2022 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Contor Treuhand AG | Zürich | 16.12.2009 | 06.03.2022 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung des Kiwanis-Clubs Zürich
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005457154, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung des Kiwanis-Clubs Zürich, in Zürich, CHE-110.305.045, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 46 vom 07.03.2022, Publ. 1005420958).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Aeberli Treuhand AG (CHE-101.652.973), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005420958, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung des Kiwanis-Clubs Zürich, in Zürich, CHE-110.305.045, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 250 vom 23.12.2020, Publ. 1005055804).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ammann, Dominique, von Roggwil BE, in Zürich, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Contor Treuhand AG (CHE-101.926.142), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Albert Massabni, Thomas David, von Bürglen (UR), in Uitikon, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Odok, Sinan Cem, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005055804, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung des Kiwanis-Clubs Zürich, in Zürich, CHE-110.305.045, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 110 vom 11.06.2018, Publ. 4280673).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wüst, Fritz, von Greifensee, in Küsnacht ZH, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Frischknecht, Kurt, von Bühler, in Winterthur, Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gontersweiler, Beat, von Zürich, in Zürich, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gubler, Robert Ernst, von Kienberg, in Horgen, Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.