Reports for SOMA VITA GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SOMA VITA GmbH
- SOMA VITA GmbH has its legal headquarters in Luzern and is active. It operates in the sector «Services for insurance and pensions».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 06.08.2001.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 02.12.2021, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company SOMA VITA GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-109.298.243.
- On the same address there are 5 other active companies registered. These include: BAXA GmbH, Helfenstein Asset Management AG, Limacher GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.08.2001
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-150.4.000.545-9
UID/VAT
CHE-109.298.243
Sector
Services for insurance and pensions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Bereich der Versicherungs- und Finanzberatung; Import und Export von sowie Handel mit in- und ausländischen Weinen, weiteren Getränken und Lebensmitteln; Anbietung von Dienstleistungen im Gesundheitsbereich; Annahme und Weitergabe von Darlehen; Handel mit Waren aller Art sowie Eingehung von Beteiligungen; Übernahme von Vertretungen; ; Erwerb, Entwicklung, Verwaltung und Verwertung von Patenten, Marken, Lizenzen, Herstellungsverfahren und Immaterialgüterrechten; Erwerb, Verwaltung, Belastung und Veräusserung von Grundstücken.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- VFD Beratungs GmbH
- Maribosa GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SOMA VITA GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005347389, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
SOMA VITA GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-109.298.243, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 27.08.2019, Publ. 1004703190).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mani, Simon, von Ferrera, in Horw, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mani-Dürring, Anita Marlise, von Ferrera, in Horw, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004703190, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
SOMA VITA GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-109.298.243, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 199 vom 13.10.2017, Publ. 3808499).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mosaic Revisions- und Treuhand AG (CHE-102.410.272), in Zug, Gesellschafterin, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Imbach, Daniel, von Luzern, in Cham, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, .
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mani-Dürring, Anita Marlise, von Ferrera, in Horw, Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Mani, Simon, von Ferrera, in Horw, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3808499, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
SOMA VITA GmbH, in Luzern, CHE-109.298.243, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 01.07.2014, Publ. 1584445).
Domizil neu:
Pilatusstrasse 23, 6003 Luzern.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mosaic Revisions- und Treuhand AG (CHE-102.410.272), in Zug, Gesellschafterin, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Mosaic Revisions- und Treuhand AG, in Hergiswil (NW)];
Imbach, Daniel, von Luzern, in Cham, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, [bisher: in Hergiswil (NW)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.