Reports for Schleuniger Montagen AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schleuniger Montagen AG
- Schleuniger Montagen AG from Dietikon operates in the sector «Other construction» and is active.
- The management of the company Schleuniger Montagen AG consists of 6 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 15.08.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company Schleuniger Montagen AG is registered under the UID CHE-113.882.853.
- Companies with an identical address: AC Swiss GmbH, ADN Lufttechnik AG, AIM Group GmbH.
Management (6)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Marco Peter Wiederkehr,
Stephan Bolliger,
David Daisuke Bolliger,
Eveline Schleuniger,
Milos Strübin
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.10.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Dietikon
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.031.582-0
UID/VAT
CHE-113.882.853
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Montage und den Unterhalt von elektrischen und elektronischen Anlagen aller Art. Sie kann damit zusammenhängende Dienstleistungen, insbesondere Beratungen, erbringen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KEEL + PARTNER AG | St. Gallen | 31.01.2019 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rovisa Wirtschaftsprüfungs AG | Dietikon | 21.04.2009 | 30.01.2019 | |
contrust finance ag | Luzern | 29.10.2007 | 20.04.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schleuniger Montagen AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005816386, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Schleuniger Montagen AG, in Dietikon, CHE-113.882.853, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 45 vom 05.03.2021, Publ. 1005116163).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wiederkehr, Marco Peter, von Ehrendingen, in Würenlos, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005116163, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Schleuniger Montagen AG, in Dietikon, CHE-113.882.853, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 21 vom 31.01.2019, Publ. 1004555036).
Statutenänderung:
26.02.2021.
Aktien neu:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 100 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bolliger, Bruno, von Zürich, in Dietikon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bolliger, Stefan, von Zürich, in Regensdorf, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Dietikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Bolliger, David, von Zürich, in Dietikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004555036, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Schleuniger Montagen AG, in Dietikon, CHE-113.882.853, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 109 vom 08.06.2017, Publ. 3566887).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rovisa Wirtschaftsprüfungs- und Beratungs AG (CHE-108.388.814), in Dietikon, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
KEEL + PARTNER AG (CHE-105.654.913), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.