Branches (1)
Reports for Nay Engineering AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Nay Engineering AG
- Nay Engineering AG has its legal headquarters in Chur, is active and operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 04.03.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company's UID is CHE-107.949.667.
- There are 9 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Autcomp AG, DP ImmoTrade AG, DP Invest AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Alexander Draxler,
Dominik Nay,
Monika Nay-Locher,
Hans Peter Nay
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.06.1978
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Chur
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.001.301-6
UID/VAT
CHE-107.949.667
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Ingenieurbüros und einer damit zusammenhängenden Generalunternehmung für Bauten und Anlagen aller Art; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bearth & Partner, Steuerberatung und Treuhand AG | Chur | 14.04.2015 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rezia Treuhand AG | Chur | 24.11.2009 | 13.04.2015 | |
Zensor Treuhand Chur AG | Chur | <2004 | 23.11.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Nay + Partner AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Nay Engineering AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005976447, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Nay Engineering AG, in Chur, CHE-107.949.667, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 23.07.2021, Publ. 1005256767).
Domizil neu:
Tittwiesenstrasse 29, 7000 Chur.
Publication number: HR02-1005256767, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Nay Engineering AG, in Chur, CHE-107.949.667, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 60 vom 27.03.2019, Publ. 1004597075).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Draxler, Alexander, von Reichenbach im Kandertal, in Sargans, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004597075, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Nay Engineering AG, in Chur, CHE-107.949.667, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 19.04.2018, Publ. 4182059).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grob, Leo, von Zürich, in Flims, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Ilic, Davor, von Thusis, in Chur, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Odermatt, Jürg, von Dallenwil, in Oberurnen (Glarus Nord), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.