Reports for Lozärn's Culinarium AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lozärn's Culinarium AG
- Lozärn's Culinarium AG is currently active and the industry «Trading in food products». The legal headquarters are in Luzern.
- The management of the company Lozärn's Culinarium AG, which was founded on the 15.03.2013, consists of 2 persons.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 18.04.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- Lozärn's Culinarium AG is registered in the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-235.165.335.
- On the same address there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: avionis gmbh, Seantis GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.03.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-241.3.011.670-2
UID/VAT
CHE-235.165.335
Sector
Trading in food products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Waren aller Art, insbesondere mit Lebensmitteln wie Öl, Essig und Spirituosen. Kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle wirtschaftlichen Tätigkeiten ausüben, die den Zweck der Gesellschaft fördern können.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Solothurn's Culinarium AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lozärn's Culinarium AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005726027, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Lozärn's Culinarium AG, in Luzern, CHE-235.165.335, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 112 vom 12.06.2020, Publ. 1004909294).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Di Marco, Monika, von Adligenswil und Luzern, in Alpnach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stirnimann, Roland, von Ruswil, in Luzern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Stirnimann-Durrer, Katrin, von Kerns, in Luzern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004909294, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Lozärn's Culinarium AG, in Luzern, CHE-235.165.335, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 231 vom 28.11.2017, Publ. 3896001).
Vermögensübertragung:
Die Gesellschaft überträgt gemäss Vertrag vom 26.05.2020 Aktiven von CHF 71'808.30 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 71'807.30 auf die neue Solodurn's Culinarium GmbH, in Solothurn (CHE-172.291.676).
Gegenleistung:
Keine.
Publication number: 3896001, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Lozärn's Culinarium AG, in Luzern, CHE-235.165.335, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 219 vom 10.11.2016, Publ. 3154619).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmidli Cometti, Alice Elisabeth, von Breggia, in Alpnach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Di Marco, Monika, von Adligenswil und Luzern, in Alpnach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.