Reports for Entex GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Entex GmbH
- Entex GmbH is a Limited liability company with its legal headquarters in Feusisberg. Entex GmbH belongs to the industry «IT services» and is currently active.
- Entex GmbH has 4 persons entered in its management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 02.06.2015. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company Entex GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-107.713.449.
- Companies with the same address as Entex GmbH: AC Ruoss GmbH, Afrika Gold AG, Agilyx GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.12.1994
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Feusisberg
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.0.007.384-8
UID/VAT
CHE-107.713.449
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringen von Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen der elektronischen Datenverarbeitung (EDV) und Informationstechnologien (IT); kann mit Waren aller Art handeln, insbesondere mit Produkten aus diesen Bereichen; kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Immaterialgüterrechte, Grundstücke sowie Wertschriften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern. Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufsrechte gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Entex GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2181111, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Entex GmbH, in Feusisberg, CHE-107.713.449, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 23.07.2014, Publ. 1628651).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Entex GmbH (CHE-107.713.449), in Feusisberg, Gesellschafterin, mit 260 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lindauer, Edgar, von Schwyz, in Freienbach, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 130 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Kälin, Roger, von Einsiedeln, in Einsiedeln, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 130 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: 1628651, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Entex GmbH, in Feusisberg, CHE-107.713.449, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 1 vom 03.01.2011, S. 9, Publ. 5970200).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pidoux, Roger, von Moudon, in Uitikon Waldegg, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 440 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kessler, Stephan, von Opfikon, in Altendorf, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 540 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 450 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Kreis, Hans, von Zürich und Roggwil TG, in Fehraltorf, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 530 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 440 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Entex GmbH (CHE-107.713.449), in Feusisberg, Gesellschafterin, mit 260 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: 5970200, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Entex GmbH, in Feusisberg, CH-130.0.007.384-8, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 18 vom 28.01.2009, S. 17, Publ. 4849988).
Statutenänderung:
26.11.2010.
Zweck neu:
Erbringen von Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen der elektronischen Datenverarbeitung (EDV) und Informationstechnologien (IT);
kann mit Waren aller Art handeln, insbesondere mit Produkten aus diesen Bereichen;
kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Immaterialgüterrechte, Grundstücke sowie Wertschriften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern. Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufsrechte gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kessler, Stephan, von Opfikon, in Altendorf, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 450 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher:mit 670 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Pidoux, Roger, von Moudon, in Uitikon Waldegg, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 440 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher:mit 660 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Kreis, Hans, von Zürich und Roggwil TG, in Fehraltorf, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 440 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.