Reports for Enbridge Finance Company AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Enbridge Finance Company AG
- Enbridge Finance Company AG is active in the industry «Operation of other financial institutions» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Luzern.
- Enbridge Finance Company AG has 4 persons entered in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 04.04.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of LU is CHE-115.999.667.
- The address is identical with 64 other active companies. These include: 3E Investment AG, 3GENGUN AG, Abundita AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
Liudmila Pavlova,
Steen James Hendry,
Heinrich Rotach,
Paul Arnold von Holzen
newest authorized signatories
Liudmila Pavlova,
Steen James Hendry,
Heinrich Rotach,
Paul Arnold von Holzen
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.09.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.035.647-6
UID/VAT
CHE-115.999.667
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Erbringung von Finanzdienstleistungen, insbesondere zu Gunsten von Gesellschaften der Enbridge Gruppe. Die Gesellschaft kann Darlehen gewähren und Sicherheiten stellen, Kredite und Anleihen aufnehmen, und die Liquiditätssteuerung sicherstellen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten und Tochtergesellschaften gründen. Die Gesellschaft kann alle mit den vorgenannten Zwecken unmittelbar oder mittelbar zusammenhängende Geschäfte tätigen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | 23.09.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Enbridge Finance Company SA
- Enbridge Finance Company Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Enbridge Finance Company AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006000376, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Enbridge Finance Company AG, in Luzern, CHE-115.999.667, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2023, Publ. 1005916784).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hendry, Steen James, kanadischer Staatsangehöriger, in Luxemburg (LU), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Calgary (CA)].
Publication number: HR02-1005916784, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Enbridge Finance Company AG, in Luzern, CHE-115.999.667, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 221 vom 14.11.2023, Publ. 1005884063).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wudrick, David, kanadischer Staatsangehöriger, in Luxemburg (LU), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pavlova, Liudmila, luxemburgische Staatsangehörige, in Luxemburg (LU), Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005884063, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Enbridge Finance Company AG, in Luzern, CHE-115.999.667, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 22.12.2022, Publ. 1005635621).
Statutenänderung:
31.10.2023.
Aktienkapital neu:
USD 443'134'016.696425 [bisher: CHF 410'000'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
USD 443'134'016.696425 [bisher: CHF 410'000'000.00].
Aktien neu:
410'000 Namenaktien zu USD 1'080.814674869329 [bisher: 410'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Qualifizierte Tatbestände neu:
[gestrichen: Sacheinlage: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Kapitalerhöhung vom 29.02.2012 gemäss Vertrag vom 29.02.2012 Forderungen in der Höhe von CHF 609'189'030.62, wofür 87'028 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 ausgegeben werden.]. [gestrichen: Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Kapitalerhöhung vom 24.11.2010 gemäss Vertrag vom 24.11.2010 Forderungen in der Höhe von CHF 1'968'196'929.81, wofür 49'900 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 ausgegeben werden und die Gesellschaft eine Schuld der Sacheinlegerin in der Höhe von CHF 1'567'975.00 übernimmt.]. [gestrichen: Sacheinlage: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Kapitalerhöhung vom 11.12.2012 gemäss Vertrag vom 11.12.2012 Forderungen in der Höhe von USD 591'681'270.55, wofür 62'972 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 ausgegeben werden.].
Mitteilungen neu:
Alle Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an ihre Aktionäre/innen erfolgen wahlweise durch Publikation im Schweizerischen Handelsamtsblatt oder in einer anderen Form der Übermittlung, die den Nachweis durch Text ermöglicht (z.B. E-Mail) an die im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Kontaktdaten der Aktionäre/innen bzw. deren Zustellungsbevollmächtigten. [Weitere Änderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.]
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.