Address
c/o Cromex SA
Via Bartolomeo Varenna 22A
6600 Locarno
Reports for Borghetto SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Borghetto SA
- Borghetto SA with its legal headquarters in Locarno is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Borghetto SA is active.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 02.10.1989.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 03.07.2024.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-101.644.353.
- Cabim SA, Cromex SA, Fossato SA have the same address as Borghetto SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.10.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Locarno
Commercial Registry Office
TI
Commercial register number
CH-524.3.001.572-1
UID/VAT
CHE-101.644.353
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language)
L'amministrazione, la detenzione, la gestione e la compravendita di immobili, l'intermediazione immobiliare, la consulenza generale nel settore immobiliare sia in Svizzera che all'estero. La società può svolgere ogni altra attività connessa con lo scopo sociale e può assumere rappresentanze e partecipazioni in imprese e società aventi scopo analogo in Svizzera e all'estero.
Auditor
Former auditor (5)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
REBEFID Sagl, succursale di Collina d'Oro | Collina d'Oro | 31.12.2014 | 16.12.2015 | |
Gardenia Group SA | Lugano | 18.10.2012 | 30.12.2014 | |
Consulca SA | Bellinzona | 20.02.2006 | 17.10.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Borghetto S.A.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Borghetto SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006074697, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Borghetto SA, in Lugano, CHE-101.644.353, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 138 del 19.07.2023, Pubbl. 1005799330).
Statuti modificati:
19.06.2024.
Nuova sede:
Locarno.
Nuovo recapito:
c/o Cromex SA, Via Bartolomeo Varenna 22A, 6600 Locarno.
Nuove comunicazioni:
Le comunicazioni della società agli azionisti avvengono mediante lettera o email.
Nuova limitazione della trasferibilità:
La trasferibilità delle azioni nominative è limitata dallo statuto.
Publication number: HR02-1005799330, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Borghetto SA, in Lugano, CHE-101.644.353, società anonima (Nr. FUSC 245 del 17.12.2015, p.0, Pubbl. 2545937).
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
Dandrea, Yvano, da Serravalle, in Bellinzona, amministratore unico, con firma individuale.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Del Miglio, Caterina, cittadina italiana, in Locarno, amministratrice unica, con firma individuale.
Publication number: 2545937, Commercial Registry Office Ticino, (501)
Borghetto SA, in Chiasso, CHE-101.644.353, società anonima (FUSC no. 252 del 31.12.2014, Pubbl. 1909925).
Statuti modificati:
04.12.2015.
Nuova sede:
Lugano.
Nuovo recapito:
c/o MULTI TRUST ADVISOR SA, Succursale di Lugano, Crocicchio Cortogna 6, 6900 Lugano.
Nuovo scopo:
L'amministrazione, la detenzione, la gestione e la compravendita di immobili, l'intermediazione immobiliare, la consulenza generale nel settore immobiliare sia in Svizzera che all'estero. La società può svolgere ogni altra attività connessa con lo scopo sociale e può assumere rappresentanze e partecipazioni in imprese e società aventi scopo analogo in Svizzera e all'estero.
Nuove azioni:
200 azioni nominative da CHF 1'000.00. [finora: 200 azioni al portatore da CHF. 1'000.00].
Nuovi conferimenti in natura e assunzioni di beni:
[Le disposizioni statutarie relative ai conferimenti in natura e all'assunzione di beni sono abrogate] [radiati: Alla società sono stati apportati beni immobili (part. 582 del comune di Giubiasco, di mq. 2041), accettati dalla società per CHF. 2'000'000.-- dedotto l'onere ipotecario di CHF. 1'800'000.-- cioé CHF. 200'000.-- netti, interamente computati sul capitale azionario.].Nuove comunicazioni: Le comunicazioni della società agli azionisti avvengono per lettera raccomandata, e-mail o fax. Con dichiarazione del 04.12.2015 la società non è soggetta alla revisione ordinaria e rinuncia a una revisione limitata.
Persone dimissionarie e firme cancellate:
Grandini, Giorgio, da Gentilino, in Viganello, amministratore unico, con firma individuale;
REBEFID Sagl, succursale di Paradiso (CHE-431.982.626), in Paradiso, ufficio di revisione.
Nuove persone iscritte o modifiche:
Dandrea, Yvano, da Serravalle, in Bellinzona, amministratore unico, con firma individuale.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.