Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Berner Oberland Medien AG BOM
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.09.2000
Deletion from the commercial register
29.05.2024
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Thun
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.014.454-9
UID/VAT
CHE-102.381.647
Sector
Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Medienunternehmens im Raum Berner Oberland. Kann das Arbeitsgebiet und die Tätigkeiten ausdehnen, diversifizieren und alle Geschäfte tätigen; kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen und solche erwerben sowie Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | 14.11.2016 | 28.05.2024 | |
von Graffenried AG Treuhand | Bern | 27.11.2006 | 13.11.2016 | |
Bernische Treuhand AG | Bern | <2004 | 26.11.2006 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Berner Oberland Medien AG BOM
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1006042347, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Berner Oberland Medien AG BOM, in Thun, CHE-102.381.647, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 241 vom 12.12.2023, Publ. 1005907357). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die Schaer Holding AG, in Bern (CHE-376.548.993), über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005907357, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Berner Oberland Medien AG BOM, in Thun, CHE-102.381.647, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 13.07.2023, Publ. 1005794409).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schaffner, Andreas, von Buus, in Oftringen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Peppel-Schulz, Jessica, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Hamburg (DE), Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Macciacchini, Sandro, von Werthenstein, in Stäfa, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Oetiker, Konrad, von Oetwil am See, in Herrliberg, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005794409, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Berner Oberland Medien AG BOM, in Thun, CHE-102.381.647, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 101 vom 27.05.2019, Publ. 1004638540).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Maurer, Peter Dr., von Adelboden, in Herrenschwanden (Kirchlindach), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Eckstein, Ulrich, von Zürich und Wigoltingen, in Bern, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Maurer, Konrad, von Adelboden, in Spiez, Delegierter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lauber, Beat Antonius Dr., von Zermatt und Zürich, in Baden, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schaffner, Andreas, von Buus, in Oftringen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Benkendorff, Wolf-Gerrit, von Otelfingen, in Boppelsen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.