Reports for Astoria-Betriebs AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Astoria-Betriebs AG
- Astoria-Betriebs AG with its legal headquarters in Luzern is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses». Astoria-Betriebs AG is active.
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 16.08.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-108.038.840.
- Personalfürsorgestiftung der Astoria-Betriebs AG, Luzern, UK Consulting AG have the same address as Astoria-Betriebs AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.08.1982
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.013.723-2
UID/VAT
CHE-108.038.840
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führung und Betrieb eines Hotelunternehmens mit Restaurants, Bars, Kiosken; Ausübung von Managementmandaten und Beratungen sowie Import von und Handel mit Wein, Spirituosen, Lebensmittel, Textilien, Möbel usw.; Beteiligungen; Erwerb und Veräusserung von Immobilien.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Santschi & Partner Treuhand AG | Reinach (BL) | 16.08.2022 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Amadeo Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Zug | 31.10.2013 | 15.08.2022 | |
Eltschinger & Partner AG | Thalwil | 04.04.2005 | 30.10.2013 | |
Mathis Treuhand AG | Zürich | <2004 | 03.04.2005 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Astoria-Betriebs AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005541709, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Astoria-Betriebs AG, in Luzern, CHE-108.038.840, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 222 vom 15.11.2021, Publ. 1005333636).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Amadeo Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-103.996.490), in Zug, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Santschi & Partner Treuhand AG (CHE-107.545.502), in Reinach (BL), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005333636, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Astoria-Betriebs AG, in Luzern, CHE-108.038.840, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 53 vom 17.03.2021, Publ. 1005125888).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Osterwalder, Marco, von Stettfurt, in Stans, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mani, Fabian, von Diemtigen, in Hergiswil (NW), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005125888, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Astoria-Betriebs AG, in Luzern, CHE-108.038.840, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 82 vom 30.04.2018, Publ. 4201257).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Waser, Pascal, von Wolfenschiessen, in Beckenried, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Osterwalder, Marco, von Stettfurt, in Stans, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.