Branches (1)
Reports for Anton Paar Switzerland AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Anton Paar Switzerland AG
- Anton Paar Switzerland AG has its legal headquarters in Baden, is active and operates in the sector «Repair and installation of machines and equipment».
- The company was founded on 27.10.2009.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 17.06.2024.
- The company Anton Paar Switzerland AG is registered under the UID CHE-115.162.356.
- On the same address as Anton Paar Switzerland AG there are 16 other active companies registered. These include: Arabelle Operations Switzerland GmbH, Baertschi Partner Bauingenieure AG, Beroba AG.
Management (3)
newest board members
Viktoria Gerhold,
Ian Collins-Hunt,
Ricardo Silveira da Costa
newest authorized signatories
Viktoria Gerhold,
Ian Collins-Hunt,
Ricardo Silveira da Costa
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.10.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Baden
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.032.160-5
UID/VAT
CHE-115.162.356
Sector
Repair and installation of machines and equipment
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Vertrieb und den Service von Labor- und Prozessgeräten, Mess- und Regelgeräten und anderen Instrumenten sowie Bauteilen Formen, Vorrichtungen und Werkzeugen. Ausserdem bezweckt die Gesellschaft die Beteiligung an und die Verwaltung von anderen Unternehmen und Gesellschaften verwandter oder gleicher Art, die Übernahme der Geschäftsführung in solchen Unternehmen und den Handel mit Waren aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte im In- und Ausland erwerben, halten, verwalten, verwerten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, die geeignet erscheinen, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die mit diesem Zusammenhängen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ostschweizerische Treuhand Zürich AG | Zürich | 02.11.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Anton Paar Suisse SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Anton Paar Switzerland AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006058820, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Anton Paar Switzerland AG, in Buchs (AG), CHE-115.162.356, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 19.03.2024, Publ. 1005989280).
Statutenänderung:
31.05.2024.
Sitz neu:
Baden.
Domizil neu:
Brown Boveri Strasse 12, 5400 Baden.
Publication number: HR02-1005989280, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Anton Paar Switzerland AG, in Buchs (AG), CHE-115.162.356, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 101 vom 26.05.2023, Publ. 1005754976).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Braga-Kribitz, Theresa, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Graz (AT), Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gerhold, Viktoria, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Graz (AT), Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005754976, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Anton Paar Switzerland AG, in Buchs (AG), CHE-115.162.356, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 12 vom 19.01.2021, Publ. 1005077598).
Statutenänderung:
26.04.2023.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Vertrieb und den Service von Labor- und Prozessgeräten, Mess- und Regelgeräten und anderen Instrumenten sowie Bauteilen Formen, Vorrichtungen und Werkzeugen. Ausserdem bezweckt die Gesellschaft die Beteiligung an und die Verwaltung von anderen Unternehmen und Gesellschaften verwandter oder gleicher Art, die Übernahme der Geschäftsführung in solchen Unternehmen und den Handel mit Waren aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte im In- und Ausland erwerben, halten, verwalten, verwerten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, die geeignet erscheinen, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die mit diesem Zusammenhängen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Adressen der Aktionäre und Nutzniesser. Sofern das Gesetz nicht zwingend etwas anderes bestimmt, kann der Verwaltungsrat Mitteilungen auch durch einmalige Publikation im Schweizerischen Handelsamtsblatt vornehmen.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.