Roland Andreas Straub
domiciled in Wettswil, from Langrickenbach Active mandates: Planzer AG, Kormos Holding AG and more Connected persons: Ivo Würsch, Marius Wendelin Buhl, Andrea Beatrix Holzer and more You can stay up to date through "Roland Andreas Straub", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Andreas Straub"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Roland Andreas Straub", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Roland Andreas Straub"
|
Places where people with the name Roland Andreas Straub live
Sectors in which people with the name Roland Andreas Straub work
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of an pension fund
Services regarding management consulting
Operation of other financial institutions
Operation of an pension fund
Services regarding management consulting
Private persons with the name Roland Andreas Straub
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Roland Andreas Straub
Publication number: HR02-1005817283, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Swiss Combi AG, in Dietikon, CHE-102.546.368, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 21.04.2020, Publ. 1004874111).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Straub, Roland Andreas, von Langrickenbach, in Wettswil am Albis, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Buhl, Marius Wendelin, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Fällanden, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005720597, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Runista AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-113.659.195, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 80 vom 27.04.2021, Publ. 1005161153). [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 19.05.2010 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Straub, Roland Andreas, von Langrickenbach, in Wettswil (Wettswil am Albis), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
OBT AG (CHE-384.364.751), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005713026, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Planzer Holding AG, in Schwyz, CHE-112.196.784, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 214 vom 03.11.2022, Publ. 1005596563).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Straub, Roland, von Langrickenbach, in Wettswil, Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hauser, Maurice, von Worb, in Winterthur, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Silberschmidt, Andri, von Zürich, in Zürich, Sekretär (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.