Cäsar Heer
domiciled in Illnau, from Glarus Active mandates: Softstore GmbH in Liquidation, Letec Chur AG in Liquidation Connected persons: Thomas Morf, Thomas Morf, Hans Stäbler and more You can stay up to date through "Cäsar Heer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Cäsar Heer"
Credit rating You can stay up to date through "Cäsar Heer", please log in or register free of charge.You are now following "Cäsar Heer"
|
Places where people with the name Cäsar Heer live
Sectors in which people with the name Cäsar Heer work
Trading with various goods
Trading in IT and communications products
Trading with various goods
Trading in IT and communications products
Private persons with the name Cäsar Heer
Moneyhouse offers you information on over 5 million private persons. This information is only available to Premium members. You can also check their credit rating to reduce financial risks.
Newest SOGC notifications: Cäsar Heer
Publication number: HR02-1005855863, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Letec Chur AG, in Chur, CHE-108.831.092, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 15 vom 22.01.2010, S.9, Publ. 5454216).
Firma neu:
Letec Chur AG in Liquidation.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist im Sinne von Art. 685a Abs. 3 OR aufgehoben.]. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 02.10.2023 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stäbler, Hans, von Oberbüren, in Bergün Filisur, Präsident, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Filisur, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Hasler, Elisa, von Arosa und Altstätten, in Bergün Filisur, Vizepräsidentin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: von Langwies und Altstätten, in Bergün/Bravuogn, Vizepräsidentin, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Heer, Cäsar, von Glarus, in Illnau-Effretikon, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Weisslingen, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Morf, Thomas, von Wangen-Brüttisellen, in Schmerikon, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005314566, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Letec IT Solutions AG, in Schaffhausen, CHE-326.239.538, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 195 vom 09.10.2014, S.0, Publ. 1759067).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Heer, Cäsar, von Glarus, in Illnau (Illnau-Effretikon), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Reutemann, Simon, von Rheinau, in Rheinau, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 1043413, Commercial Registry Office Schaffhausen, (290)
Letec IT Solutions AG, in Neuhausen am Rheinfall, CH-290.3.017.527-2, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 121 vom 26.06.2013, Publ. 940699).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Heer, Cäsar, von Glarus, in Illnau (Illnau-Effretikon), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: einziges Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Riesen, Philipp, von Rüschegg, in Schaffhausen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Reutemann, Simon, von Rheinau, in Rheinau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.