Branches (5)
Reports for Volare Group AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Volare Group AG
- Volare Group AG in Suhr is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of other financial institutions». Volare Group AG is active.
- The company was founded on 16.10.1975.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 26.07.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-102.607.834.
- Companies with an identical address: Aare Mittelland Immo AG, Bau Immo Pool AG, e-fuels2go AG.
Management (9)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Andreas Benedikt Plattner Klopfenstein,
Ramon Beat Werner,
Nora El Kamel,
Jürg Wiesendanger,
Christoph Andreas Lötscher
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.10.1975
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Suhr
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.001.980-1
UID/VAT
CHE-102.607.834
CHE-225.845.090 VAT
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb und Verkauf, Halten und Verwalten von Beteiligungen an in- und ausländischen Unternehmen aller Art, ferner Anlage und Verwaltung des sonstigen Vermögens; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
thv AG | Aarau | 04.10.1999 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Oel-Pool AG
- UNI-Oil Tanklager AG
- Uni-Oil Tanklager AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Volare Group AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006095042, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Volare Group AG, in Suhr, CHE-102.607.834, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 187 vom 27.09.2023, Publ. 1005846979).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lötscher, Christoph, von Escholzmatt-Marbach, in Safnern, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Plattner Klopfenstein, Andreas, von Reigoldswil, in Dietikon, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005846979, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Volare Group AG, in Suhr, CHE-102.607.834, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 217 vom 08.11.2021, Publ. 1005329037).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der Advitec Holding AG, in Suhr (CHE-114.013.601), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 18.09.2023 und Bilanz per 30.06.2023. Aktiven von CHF 69'224'805.44 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 1'400.00 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da die übernehmende Gesellschaft sämtliche Aktien der übertragenden Gesellschaft hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Publication number: HR02-1005329037, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Volare Group AG, in Suhr, CHE-102.607.834, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 238 vom 07.12.2020, Publ. 1005041004).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meyer, Stéphane, von Buchs (AG), in Aarau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Duttwiler, Konrad, von Ehrendingen, in Muhen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Werner, Ramon, von Neuhausen am Rheinfall, in Wollerau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Ballwil, ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.