Reports for TFB AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout TFB AG
- TFB AG with its legal headquarters in Wildegg is active. TFB AG operates in the sector «Technical, physical and chemical testing».
- The company was founded on 18.12.2017.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 27.08.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-432.415.979.
- The company TFB AG has currently registered 2 different trademarks or applications for trademarks.
- Next to the company TFB AG there are 4 other active companies with an identical address. These include: S-Cert AG, TFB Diagnostic Systems AG, TFB Holding AG.
Management (7)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Daniela Amsler Obrist,
Arno Catrina,
André Renggli,
Jürg Poppel,
Fernand Deillon
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.12.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Möriken-Wildegg
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.443.619-3
UID/VAT
CHE-432.415.979
Sector
Technical, physical and chemical testing
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausführen von fachlich neutralen und unabhängiger Prüfung, Untersuchung und Beratung, Aus- und Weiterbildung mit den Schwerpunkten mineralische Bindemittel, Beton, Betonbau und Asphalt sowie Entwicklung und Vertrieb der dazu erforderlichen Hilfs- und Betriebsmittel; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
RRT AG Treuhand und Revision | Chur | 04.06.2024 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Aarau | 21.12.2017 | 03.06.2024 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
TFB | 26.05.2011 | active | 63714/2010 |
26.05.2011 | deleted | 63717/2010 |
Newest SOGC notifications: TFB AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006115309, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
TFB AG, in Möriken-Wildegg, CHE-432.415.979, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 106 vom 04.06.2024, Publ. 1006047651).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wasmer, Roger, von Eggerberg, in Hendschiken, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Amsler, Daniela, von Niederlenz, in Rüfenach, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006047651, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
TFB AG, in Möriken-Wildegg, CHE-432.415.979, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 130 vom 07.07.2023, Publ. 1005790214).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
BDO AG (CHE-345.012.024), in Aarau, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Klemm, Veronika, von Niederlenz, in Niederlenz, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: deutsche Staatsangehörige];
RRT AG Treuhand und Revision (CHE-107.060.038), in Chur, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005790214, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
TFB AG, in Möriken-Wildegg, CHE-432.415.979, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2017, Publ. 3948771).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kündig, Daniel, von Rüschlikon, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Brenner, Karin, von Luzern, in Möriken-Wildegg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Catrina, Arno, von Andeer, in Chur, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Poppel, Jürg, von Domat/Ems, in Chur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Renggli, André, von Chur und Entlebuch, in Chur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.