Reports for sdplus conseils sa
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout sdplus conseils sa
- sdplus conseils sa is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Lausanne. sdplus conseils sa belongs to the industry «Services regarding management consulting» and is currently active.
- The management of the company sdplus conseils sa consists of 4 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 13.02.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VD is CHE-107.563.871.
- Companies with the same address as sdplus conseils sa: 7ème délice Zhioua K., Ahena Food and Services Sàrl, CENTRE DE LA PRÉSENCE SÀRL.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Jean-François Waldemar André Wavre,
Nicolas Maurice Lucien Berriot,
Jean-Daniel Camille Girard,
Kornilios Fotiadis
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.02.1994
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lausanne
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.024.764-1
UID/VAT
CHE-107.563.871
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Conseils et services en matière de gestion, finance, comptabilité, fiscalité, informatique, management de la qualité, expertises techniques, pilotage d'opérations, appui aux maîtres d'ouvrages, y compris vente et installation de matériel informatique.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Multifiduciaire Fribourg S.A. | Fribourg | 08.08.2016 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Burkhalter et partenaires SA | Crissier | <2004 | 07.08.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SD société de gestion et conseils S.A.
- SD société de gestion et conseils SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: sdplus conseils sa
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005960207, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
sdplus conseils sa, à Lausanne, CHE-107.563.871 (FOSC du 08.09.2023, p. 0/1005834372). Girard Jean-Daniel n'est plus directeur.
Publication number: HR02-1005834372, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
sdplus conseils sa, à Lausanne, CHE-107.563.871 (FOSC du 07.09.2022, p. 0/1005557009). Signature collective à deux est conférée à Wavre Jean-François, de Neuchâtel, à Prilly, directeur.
Publication number: HR02-1005557009, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
sdplus conseils sa, à Lausanne, CHE-107.563.871 (FOSC du 04.10.2019, p. 0/1004730890). Décoppet Pierre François n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Berriot Nicolas, de et à Châtel-Saint-Denis, est membre président du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.