Reports for Schwyzerhüsli Niederwil GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schwyzerhüsli Niederwil GmbH
- Schwyzerhüsli Niederwil GmbH with its legal headquarters in Niederwil AG is active. Schwyzerhüsli Niederwil GmbH operates in the sector «Operation of restaurants».
- The company was founded on 08.08.2016.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 13.04.2017, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-429.009.337.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.08.2016
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Niederwil (AG)
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.4.441.520-3
UID/VAT
CHE-429.009.337
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Restaurants sowie Erbringen von Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen Catering und Party-Service; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schwyzerhüsli Niederwil GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3468437, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Schwyzerhüsli Niederwil GmbH, in Niederwil (AG), CHE-429.009.337, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 154 vom 11.08.2016, Publ. 2999483).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Leonhard, Richard, von Wädenswil, in Mägenwil, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Montinero, Manuela, von Fislisbach, in Mellingen, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: 2999483, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Schwyzerhüsli Niederwil GmbH, in Niederwil (AG), CHE-429.009.337, Hauptstrasse 13, 5524 Niederwil AG, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
13.07.2016.
Zweck:
Betrieb eines Restaurants sowie Erbringen von Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen Catering und Party-Service;
kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00. Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufrechte gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail.
Vinkulierung:
Vom Gesetz abweichende Modalitäten für die Abtretung von Stammanteilen gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten. Gemäss Erklärung der Gründer vom 13.07.2016 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Montinero, Manuela, von Fislisbach, in Mellingen, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Leonhard, Richard, von Wädenswil, in Mägenwil, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.