Branches (1)
Reports for Ryf AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ryf AG
- Ryf AG has its legal headquarters in Grenchen, is active and operates in the sector «Trading with various goods».
- The management of the company Ryf AG consists of 5 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 12.09.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-106.926.853.
- Companies with the same address as Ryf AG: Daniel Ryf Holding AG, fotoryf gmbh, Löwen Haus GmbH.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Thierry Burger,
Corinne Schneider,
Philipp Bieri,
Hans Ryf,
Daniel Ryf
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.04.1994
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Grenchen
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-254.3.000.725-9
UID/VAT
CHE-106.926.853
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Herstellen und Handel mit Waren aller Art, insbesondere von Konsum und Investitionsgüter aus dem Bereich Foto, Video, Kino und optische Instrumente. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Rüfenacht Heer Partner AG Zweigniederlassung Grenchen | Grenchen | 02.10.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FISTRA AG | Grenchen | <2004 | 01.10.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ryf AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006128128, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Ryf AG, in Grenchen, CHE-106.926.853, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 05.07.2023, Publ. 1005787229).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rüfenacht Heer Partner AG Zweigniederlassung Grenchen (CHE-167.364.921), in Grenchen, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Wadsack Solothurn AG Zweigniederlassung Grenchen (CHE-167.364.921)].
Publication number: HR02-1005787229, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Ryf AG, in Grenchen, CHE-106.926.853, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 109 vom 08.06.2022, Publ. 1005490408).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Burger, Thierry, von Heiligenschwendi, in Hasle bei Burgdorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005490408, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Ryf AG, in Grenchen, CHE-106.926.853, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 29 vom 10.02.2022, Publ. 1005402289).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Isler, Olivier, von Richterswil, in Sutz-Lattrigen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.