Reports for Ringier AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ringier AG
- Ringier AG with its legal headquarters in Zofingen is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)». Ringier AG is active.
- Ringier AG was founded on 28.10.2019.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 19.07.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company Ringier AG is registered under the UID CHE-298.430.158.
- The company Ringier AG has currently registered 294 different trademarks or applications for trademarks.
- Next to the company Ringier AG there are 17 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Climartis Services AG, Dialogart GmbH, Dipeco AG.
Management (36)
newest board members
Urs Berger,
Dr. Stefan Mäder,
Anna Mossberg,
Nancy Cruickshank,
Michèle Françoise Rodoni
newest authorized signatories
Lars Thomas Ihme,
Marieke Van Den Berg,
Serafin Oberholzer,
Sascha Werner Hilpert,
Thomas Kords
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.10.2019
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zofingen
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.446.527-9
UID/VAT
CHE-298.430.158
CHE-116.266.745 VAT
Sector
Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt alle Tätigkeiten im Medienbereich und in der Informationsvermittlung, insbesondere im Verlagswesen, im Bereich der transaktionsbasierten Internetplattformen, sowie das Halten von Beteiligungen an solchen Unternehmen. Die Gesellschaft ist befugt, Veranstaltungs-, Unterhaltungs- und Gastwirtschaftsbetriebe zu führen, Finanzierungs- und Sanierungsmassnahmen zu Gunsten von Aktionären, Konzerngesellschaften oder Dritten vorzunehmen sowie Aktionären, Konzerngesellschaften und Dritten Darlehen oder für deren Verpflichtungen Sicherheiten zu gewähren. Die Gesellschaft kann Tochtergesellschaften und Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten und sich im In- und Ausland an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann auch alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 31.10.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Ringier Ltd
- Ringier SA
- Ringier Business SA
- Ringier Business Ltd
- Ringier Business AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
- | pending application | 12880/2024 | |
- | pending application | 12881/2024 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Ringier AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006089439, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Ringier AG, in Zofingen, CHE-298.430.158, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 79 vom 24.04.2024, Publ. 1006016823).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gross, Steffen, von Dübendorf, in Zürich, Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ihme, Lars, von Uitikon, in Uitikon, Vizedirektor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
van den Berg, Marieke, niederländische Staatsangehörige, in Zollikon, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006016823, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Ringier AG, in Zofingen, CHE-298.430.158, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 19.04.2024, Publ. 1006013442).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schuler, Helene, von Arth, in Steinhausen, Vizedirektorin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Oberholzer, Serafin, von Zürich, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: SR01-0000010788, Commercial Registry Office Zurich
Rubrik: Weitere gesellschaftsrechtliche Schuldenrufe Unterrubrik: Schuldenruf infolge Fusion nach FusG Publikationsdatum: SHAB 23.04.2024, Mehrfache Veröffentlichung: 22.04.2024, 24.04.2024 Öffentlich einsehbar bis: 23.04.2027 Meldungsnummer: Publizierende Stelle Walder Wyss AG, Seefeldstrasse 123, 8008 Zürich Schuldenruf infolge Fusion nach FusG Ringier Magazine AG mit Ringier AG
Ringier AG z.Hd. Lars Ihme Brühlstrasse 5
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.