Reports for Patoro AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Patoro AG
- Patoro AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Olten. Patoro AG belongs to the industry «Trading with various goods» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 06.08.2001 and has 5 persons in its management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 03.03.2014, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Patoro AG is the following: CHE-109.108.495.
- There are currently 5 trademarks or applications for the company Patoro AG in the IPI database.
Management (5)
newest board members
Pablo Richard,
Daniel Fluri,
Patrik Jonas Martin,
Patrick Marco Bellomo-Haas,
Markus Schönenberger
newest authorized signatories
Pablo Richard,
Daniel Fluri,
Patrik Jonas Martin,
Patrick Marco Bellomo-Haas,
Markus Schönenberger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.08.2001
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Olten
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.004.775-9
UID/VAT
CHE-109.108.495
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Produktion, Vertrieb und Promotion von luxuriösen Konsum- und Genussgütern. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an gleichartigen oder verwandten Unternehmen beteiligen, Treuhandgeschäfte abwickeln, Grundstücke erwerben, veräussern und Verwaltungen führen sowie Aktien erwerben oder verwalten.
Auditor
Former auditor (4)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Copartner Revision AG | Basel | 01.03.2010 | 14.09.2010 | |
stopp gmbh Treuhand & Consulting | Münchenstein | 05.12.2006 | 28.02.2010 | |
Deloitte AG | Basel | 25.06.2004 | 04.12.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Patoro Ltd
- Patoro SA
- Luxury Trading AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
11.10.2018 | active | 79744/2018 | |
10.06.2010 | active | 52323/2010 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Patoro AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1374417, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Patoro AG, in Olten, CHE-109.108.495, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 191 vom 02.10.2012, Publ. 6871758).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Richard, Dr. Pablo, von Wynau, in Evilard, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 6871758, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Patoro AG, in Olten, CH-280.3.004.775-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 172 vom 05.09.2012, S. 0, Publ. 6836316).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bellomo, Patrick Marco, von Oberdorf BL, in Aesch BL, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 6836316, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Patoro AG, in Olten, CH-280.3.004.775-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 20 vom 28.01.2011, S. 13, Publ. 6007588).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
D'Ambrosio, Pasquale, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bottmingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fluri, Daniel, von Solothurn, in Solothurn, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.