About PAN TRUST I
- The management has 0 active persons registered.
- The last commercial register change was made on 12.09.2015. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Latest notifications for PAN TRUST I
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 20199891, (1)
Handelsregister 12.09.2015, PAN TRUST I, unbekannt (FL-0002.495.724-1)Treuhänderschaft Erloschene Angaben zur Verwaltung: First Trust Management AG, 9490 Vaduz, Treuhänderin.
Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend:
CONCORDANZ ANSTALT, 9494 Schaan, Treuhänderin.
Publication number: 20197043, (1)
Handelsregister 27.06.2015, PAN TRUST I, unbekannt (FL-0002.495.724-1)Treuhänderschaft Erloschene Angaben zur Verwaltung: Wanger, Dr. Markus Hugo, StA: Liechtenstein, 9490 Vaduz, Treuhänder.
Angaben zur Verwaltung neu oder mutierend:
First Trust Management AG, 9490 Vaduz, Treuhänderin.
Publication number: 20193182, (1)
Handelsregister 26/03/2015, PAN TRUST I, unbekannt (FL-0002.495.724-1)Treuhänderschaft (Neueintragung).
Datum der Errichtung:
24.03.2015.
Dauer:
80 Jahre, d.h. bis 2095.
Angaben zur Verwaltung:
Wanger, Dr. Markus Hugo, StA: Liechtenstein, 9490 Vaduz, Treuhänder.