Address
c/o Otto Notter Holding AG
Aeschstrasse 10
5610 Wohlen AG
Reports for NOJARA Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout NOJARA Holding AG
- NOJARA Holding AG is active in the industry «Operation of other financial institutions» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Wohlen AG.
- NOJARA Holding AG was founded on 15.05.2013.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 02.10.2023.
- The reported UID is CHE-213.701.395.
- There are 5 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Notter Hochbau AG, Notter Immo AG, Notter Tiefbau AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Simon Zwicker,
Daniela Notter-Lienhard,
Martin Koch,
Ralph Notter
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.05.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wohlen (AG)
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.036.785-7
UID/VAT
CHE-213.701.395
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerben, Halten, Verwalten und Verkaufen von Beteiligungen und Gesellschaften; kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen irgendwelcher Art beteiligen, Vertretungen übernehmen, Darlehen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung sowie Garantien und Pfandrechtsgeschäfte für verbundene Unternehmungen und Dritte eingehen, Immobilien erwerben, verpachten, vermieten, belasten und veräussern sowie jede Art von Schuld oder Wertpapieren erwerben, halten, verwalten oder verkaufen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Aarau | 21.05.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: NOJARA Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005849997, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
NOJARA Holding AG, in Wohlen (AG), CHE-213.701.395, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 195 vom 07.10.2022, Publ. 1005578413).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kleeb, Andreas, von Zug, in Zug, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Notter, Ralph, von Boswil, in Zufikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Zwicker, Simon, von Waldkirch, in Buchs (AG), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005578413, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
NOJARA Holding AG, in Wohlen (AG), CHE-213.701.395, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 133 vom 12.07.2013, S.0, Publ. 973397).
Domizil neu:
c/o Otto Notter Holding AG, Aeschstrasse 10, 5610 Wohlen AG.
Publication number: 973397, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
NOJARA Holding AG, in Wohlen AG, CHE-213.701.395, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 95 vom 21.05.2013, Publ. 7194122).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Notter, Ralph, von Boswil, in Zufikon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Kleeb, Andreas, von Zug, in Zug, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Notter, Daniela, von Boswil, in Zufikon, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Koch, Martin, von Widen, in Sarmenstorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.