Reports for Lukullus Catering AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Lukullus Catering AG
- Lukullus Catering AG is active in the industry «Operation of restaurants» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Sursee.
- The management of the company Lukullus Catering AG consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 09.09.2008.
- On the 11.04.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-114.489.671.
- The address is identical with 5 other active companies. These include: Balber Group GmbH, Neax GmbH, Neax Holding AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.09.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sursee
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.789.337-5
UID/VAT
CHE-114.489.671
Sector
Operation of restaurants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Planung, Ausführung und Beratung von Cateringanlässen und Events; Handel mit dazugehörenden Produkten; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Grundstücken, Urheberrechten, Patenten und Lizenzen aller Art.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Gastroconsult AG | Luzern | 05.12.2022 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Lukullus Catering AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006006350, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Lukullus Catering AG, in Sursee, CHE-114.489.671, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 236 vom 05.12.2022, Publ. 1005619275).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sidler, Damian, von Zug, in Sursee, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sidler, Gabriel Anton, von Zug, in Uster, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Sidler, Gabriel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1005619275, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Lukullus Catering AG, in Sursee, CHE-114.489.671, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 192 vom 04.10.2021, Publ. 1005303895). [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 08.09.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sidler, Damian, von Zug, in Sursee, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Rickenbach (LU)];
Gastroconsult AG (CHE-454.882.208), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005303895, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Lukullus Catering AG, in Sursee, CHE-114.489.671, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 153 vom 10.08.2021, Publ. 1005267877).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sidler, Damian, von Zug, in Rickenbach (LU), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Klopfer, Heike, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Schwarzach (AT), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Sidler, Gabriel, von Zug, in Uster, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.