About L-SaT Aktiengesellschaft
- L-SaT Aktiengesellschaft was founded on 17.05.2006.
- On the 30.06.2006 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Latest notifications for L-SaT Aktiengesellschaft
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 20032187, (1)
Vaterland, 30.06.2006, 146, 2006 Öffentlichkeitsregisteramt, Änderung, 28.06.2006, 6007.340 L-SaT Aktiengesellschaft, Vaduz (FL-2.026.539) Zustelladresse: Industriestrasse 20, 9493 Mauren
Publication number: 20031121, (1)
Vaterland, 17.05.2006, 111, 2006 Öffentlichkeitsregisteramt, Änderung, 12.05.2006, 5251.340 L-SaT Aktiengesellschaft, Vaduz (FL-2.026.539) Zustelladresse: Schaaner Strasse 1, 9490 Vaduz.
Wurde gelöscht:
Geschäftsführer, Ralf Martin.
Wurde bestellt:
Mitglied, Geschäftsführer, Einzelunterschrift, Dr. Wolgang Krones, 1040 Wien, Oesterreich.
Heimatland:
Oesterreich.
Zeichnungsrechtsänderung:
Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, Claus Robert Müller, 3400 Klosterneuburg