Reports for Küpfer Holding SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Küpfer Holding SA
- Küpfer Holding SA is currently active and the industry «Operation of other financial institutions». The legal headquarters are in Bex.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 11.04.2012.
- The last commercial register change was made on 19.07.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- In the commercial register the company Küpfer Holding SA is registered under the UID CHE-383.209.958.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.04.2012
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bex
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.106.084-0
UID/VAT
CHE-383.209.958
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'acquisition, l'administration et la gestion de participations à des entreprises commerciales, industrielles, financières ou de services (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ORFA Audit SA | Lausanne | 08.03.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Axios Fiduciaire Sàrl | Martigny | 16.11.2012 | 07.03.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Küpfer Holding SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006089625, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Küpfer Holding SA, à Bex, CHE-383.209.958 (FOSC du 05.10.2023, p. 0/1005853783). Lovey Laurent n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Publication number: HR02-1005853783, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Küpfer Holding SA, à Bex, CHE-383.209.958 (FOSC du 08.03.2023, p. 0/1005696004). Lovey Laurent n'est plus président. Lelièvre Claude, de Vuisternens-devant-Romont, à Servion, président, avec signature individuelle, et Sarbach Cédric, de Adelboden, à Servion, avec signature collective à deux, sont membres du conseil d'administration.
Publication number: HR02-1005696004, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Küpfer Holding SA, à Bex, CHE-383.209.958 (FOSC du 09.06.2022, p. 0/1005491875).
Nouvelle adresse:
Route Industrielle 8, 1880 Bex. Axios Fiduciaire Sàrl (CHE-175.503.202) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
ORFA Audit SA (CHE-101.585.153), à Lausanne.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.