Reports for Kobelt AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kobelt AG
- Kobelt AG is currently active and the industry «General structural engineering». The legal headquarters are in Marbach SG.
- There are 9 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 14.05.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company's UID is CHE-105.828.691.
Management (9)
newest board members
Michael Breitenmoser,
Melina Härtsch-Morant,
Prisco Kaufmann,
Peter Paul Meister,
Markus Paul Morant
newest authorized signatories
Michael Breitenmoser,
Dominik Sieber,
Urs Haltiner,
Melina Härtsch-Morant,
Prisco Kaufmann
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.01.1931
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Marbach (SG)
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.000.136-5
UID/VAT
CHE-105.828.691
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer Generalunternehmung zur Erstellung von schlüsselfertigen Bauten sowie eines Architekturbüros, einer Zimmerei und einer Schreinerei; kann andere Betriebe der Baunebenbranche führen und entsprechende Produkte herstellen oder vertreiben. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten sowie Grundstücke erwerben, verkaufen und vermieten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Zovag src GmbH | Widnau | 22.02.2024 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Zovag Treuhand AG | Widnau | 30.08.2010 | 21.02.2024 | |
OBT AG | St. Gallen | <2004 | 11.10.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Kobelt Adolf AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kobelt AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006031626, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Kobelt AG, in Marbach (SG), CHE-105.828.691, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 37 vom 22.02.2024, Publ. 1005968259).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Breitenmoser, Michael, von Appenzell, in Scherzingen (Münsterlingen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005968259, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Kobelt AG, in Marbach (SG), CHE-105.828.691, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 20 vom 30.01.2024, Publ. 1005947678).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zovag Treuhand AG (CH-320.9.056.751-8), in Widnau, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zovag src GmbH (CHE-113.061.483), in Widnau, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005947678, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Kobelt AG, in Marbach (SG), CHE-105.828.691, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 192 vom 04.10.2023, Publ. 1005852262).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sieber, Dominik, von Widnau, in Widnau, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.