Reports for JUST INVESTMENTS Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout JUST INVESTMENTS Sàrl
- JUST INVESTMENTS Sàrl is a Limited liability company with its legal headquarters in Biel/Bienne. JUST INVESTMENTS Sàrl belongs to the industry «Services for insurance and pensions» and is currently active.
- JUST INVESTMENTS Sàrl has 2 persons entered in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 03.05.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-114.932.353.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.06.2009
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Biel/Bienne
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.4.045.040-4
UID/VAT
CHE-114.932.353
Sector
Services for insurance and pensions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Le but de la société est le courtage de produits financiers et d'assurances, l'expertise et la gestion dans le domaine financier et la recherche de financement. La société peut créer des succursales en Suisse et à l'étranger, participer à d'autres entreprises, acquérir ou fonder des entreprises visant un but identique ou analogue, effectuer toutes opérations mobilières et immobilières, et conclure tous contrats propres à développer son but ou s'y rapportant directement ou indirectement.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: JUST INVESTMENTS Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006024267, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
JUST INVESTMENTS Sàrl, à Biel/Bienne, CHE-114.932.353, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 56 du 21.03.2014, p.0, Publ. 1409807).
Nouvelle adresse:
Route d'Orpond 27, 2504 Biel/Bienne.
Publication number: 1409807, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
JUST INVESTMENTS Sàrl, à Biel/Bienne, CHE-114.932.353, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 71 du 11.04.2011, Publ. 6116802).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Cristofori, Fausto, ressortissant italien, à Lutry, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associé et président de l'organe de gestion avec signature individuelle];
Cristofori, David, ressortissant italien, à Biel/Bienne, associé, sans droit de signature, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: associé et gérant et vice-président avec signature collective à deux avec le président].
Publication number: 6116802, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
JUST INVESTMENTS Sàrl, à Biel/Bienne, CH-036.4.045.040-4, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 124 du 01.07.2009, p. 5, Publ. 5103208).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Pincio, Antonio, ressortissant italien, à Frinvillier (Vauffelin), associé et gérant et secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux avec le président, pour 66 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Cristofori, Fausto, ressortissant italien, à Lutry, associé et président de l'organe de gestion, avec signature individuelle, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: avec 68 parts sociale de CHF 100.00];
Cristofori, David, ressortissant italien, à Biel/Bienne, associé et gérant et vice-président, avec signature collective à deux avec le président, pour 100 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: avec 66 parts sociale de CHF 100.00].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.