Reports for IFIT Corporate + Compliance AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout IFIT Corporate + Compliance AG
- IFIT Corporate + Compliance AG from Zürich operates in the sector «Services regarding management consulting» and is active.
- The company was founded on 14.07.2005 and has one person in its management.
- On the 13.05.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- IFIT Corporate + Compliance AG is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-112.447.331.
- Asteras GmbH, Baldur GmbH, Gabelli & Partners GmbH have the same address as IFIT Corporate + Compliance AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.07.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.028.520-7
UID/VAT
CHE-112.447.331
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen, insbesondere betreffend Compliance und Risiko Management. Weiter bezweckt die Gesellschaft die Erbringung von Managementdienstleistungen, von Rechtsberatung mit Einschluss von Gesellschaftsgründungen, von Steuerberatung, die Übernahme von oder die Unterstützung der Geschäftsführung von Gesellschaften, die Ausübung von Treuhandmandaten sowie ganz allgemein die wirtschaftliche Beratung von Unternehmen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an Unternehmen jeglicher Art beteiligen. Sie kann ferner alle Geschäfte durchführen, die dem Gesellschaftszweck unmittelbar oder mittelbar zu dienen geeignet sind. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und/oder finanzieren, sich im In- und Ausland an andern Gesellschaften beteiligen, Dritte vertreten, sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sein können, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für verbundene Unternehmen eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (4)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Balmer-Etienne AG | Zürich | 13.01.2016 | 09.01.2018 | |
Balmer-Etienne AG | Luzern | 10.10.2013 | 27.10.2015 | |
Trevisca AG | Baar | 22.05.2006 | 09.10.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- AES Commodities AG
- IFIT advisory AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: IFIT Corporate + Compliance AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006029788, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
IFIT Corporate + Compliance AG, in Zürich, CHE-112.447.331, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 6 vom 10.01.2018, Publ. 3978567).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Braine, Liliane Marie-Louise, belgische Staatsangehörige, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 3978567, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
IFIT Corporate + Compliance AG, in Zürich, CHE-112.447.331, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 100 vom 24.05.2017, Publ. 3540709). Gemäss Erklärung vom 22.12.2017 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Balmer-Etienne AG, in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 3540709, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
IFIT Corporate + Compliance AG, in Zürich, CHE-112.447.331, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 243 vom 14.12.2016, Publ. 3220663).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Weber, Johannes Michael, von Tobel-Tägerschen, in Zürich, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.