Reports for Glutz AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Glutz AG
- Glutz AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Solothurn. Glutz AG belongs to the industry «Manufacturing of tools, cutting implements and locks» and is currently active.
- The management of the company Glutz AG consists of 15 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 25.04.1991.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 08.05.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-101.515.974.
- The IPI database currently contains 22 trademarks or applications for the company Glutz AG.
- Companies with the same address as Glutz AG: Segetz AG, Wohlfahrtsstiftung der Glutz Gruppe.
Management (15)
newest board members
Theodor Strausak,
Dr. Alexander Maximilian Urs Glutz von Blotzheim,
Dr. Stephan Alexander Johann Segesser von Brunegg,
Martin Kaufmann,
Prof. Dr. Ludwig Philipp Karl Segesser von Brunegg
Executive board
Roman Reto Schickel,
Sascha Lauber,
Marco Andrin Timon Hauri
newest authorized signatories
Roman Reto Schickel,
Sascha Lauber,
Kevin Steinbach,
Marco Andrin Timon Hauri,
Theodor Strausak
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.04.1991
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Solothurn
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-260.3.000.223-6
UID/VAT
CHE-101.515.974
CHE-116.304.908 VAT
Sector
Manufacturing of tools, cutting implements and locks
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrikation von Schlössern, Beschlägen und weiteren Erzeugnissen der Metall- und Apparate-Industrie sowie Handel mit solchen Erzeugnissen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich bei anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen und Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Solothurn | <2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
VGB | - | pending application | 12397/2024 |
TRIAS | 11.09.2024 | active | 12512/2024 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Glutz AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006027804, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Glutz AG, in Solothurn, CHE-101.515.974, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 45 vom 05.03.2024, Publ. 1005977566).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Niederberger, Hubert, von Dallenwil, in Giswil, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schickel, Roman Reto, von Basel, in Maur, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005977566, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Glutz AG, in Solothurn, CHE-101.515.974, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 225 vom 20.11.2023, Publ. 1005888762).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Isch, Simon, von Buchegg, in Bern, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005888762, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Glutz AG, in Solothurn, CHE-101.515.974, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 208 vom 26.10.2023, Publ. 1005869667).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hauri, Marco, von Hirschthal, in Galgenen, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Isch, Simon, von Buchegg, in Bern, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Lauber, Sascha, von Weiach, in Obergerlafingen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Niederberger, Hubert, von Dallenwil, in Giswil, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.