Reports for GFP mediconsul GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout GFP mediconsul GmbH
- GFP mediconsul GmbH is currently active and the industry «Services for insurance and pensions». The legal headquarters are in Kirchberg BE.
- The management consists of 2 persons. The company was founded on 16.04.1992.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 27.07.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-103.576.001.
- The address is identical with 2 other active companies. These include: GFP consulting AG, GFSA Insurance AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.04.1992
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Kirchberg (BE)
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.4.003.409-8
UID/VAT
CHE-103.576.001
Sector
Services for insurance and pensions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist die Vermittlung von Versicherungsverträgen aller Art, Risk-Management und Versicherungsberatung. Sie kann gleichartigen Unternehmungen die Infrastruktur gegen Entgelt zur Verfügung stellen, Zweigniederlassungen in der Schweiz und im Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten oder weiterveräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen. Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufsrechte: gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Leuthard + Suter GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: GFP mediconsul GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005805047, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
GFP mediconsul GmbH, in Kirchberg (BE), CHE-103.576.001, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 01.02.2017, Publ. 3319667).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Suter, Roman, von Würenlingen, in Bern, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3319667, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
GFP mediconsul GmbH, in Kirchberg (BE), CHE-103.576.001, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 248 vom 21.12.2010, Publ. 5951046).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Leuthard, Stephan, von Merenschwand, in Oberwil b. Zug (Zug), Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Suter, Andres, von Würenlingen, in Sugiez (Mont-Vully), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Kirchberg BE, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: 5951046, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
GFP mediconsul GmbH, in Kirchberg BE, CH-053.4.003.409-8, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 238 vom 07.12.2010, S. 4, Publ. 5926644).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Leuthard, Stephan, von Merenschwand, in Oberwil bei Zug (Zug), Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift];
Suter, Andres, von Würenlingen, in Kirchberg BE, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.