Reports for Experis Schweiz AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Experis Schweiz AG
- Experis Schweiz AG from Zürich operates in the sector «IT services» and is active.
- The management of the company Experis Schweiz AG, which was founded on the 01.07.2004, consists of 6 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 19.09.2024.
- The company's UID is CHE-111.748.126.
- There are 19 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: andrion ag, Astrum Assistance Alliance AG, Audatex (Schweiz) GmbH.
Management (6)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Eric Alexandre Marie Jeannerod,
Emma Lucy Pasea,
Eleva Ott,
Peter Wassmer,
Donald Olvis Mondano
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.07.2004
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.027.893-3
UID/VAT
CHE-111.748.126
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen in den Bereichen Informatik und Unternehmensberatung, die Entwicklung von Software sowie den Vertrieb von Hard- und Software. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte AG | Zürich | 23.08.2006 | 12.10.2010 | |
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | 07.07.2004 | 22.08.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Experis Suisse SA
- Experis Switzerland Ltd
- Elan IT Resource Schweiz AG
- MRC Consulting AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Experis Schweiz AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006132945, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Experis Schweiz AG, in Zürich, CHE-111.748.126, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 168 vom 30.08.2024, Publ. 1006117835).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jacob, Jan Martin, von Trogen, in Zollikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006117835, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Experis Schweiz AG, in Zürich, CHE-111.748.126, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 22.05.2024, Publ. 1006036570).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
McGinty, Michael J., britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Füllinsdorf, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006036570, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Experis Schweiz AG, in Zürich, CHE-111.748.126, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 28.12.2023, Publ. 1005921205).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Scabbio, Stefano, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Saronno (IT), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jeannerod, Eric, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Pasea, Emma Lucy, britische Staatsangehörige, in Lancy, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.