Reports for MOORE ST. GALLEN AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout MOORE ST. GALLEN AG
- MOORE ST. GALLEN AG is active in the industry «Fiduciary services» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in St. Gallen.
- The management consists of 12 persons. The company was founded on 10.01.1980.
- The last commercial register change was made on 25.09.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company's UID is CHE-103.993.333.
- The address is identical with 35 other active companies. These include: Amolit AG, Bratschi AG, Chemie-Faser Ebnat AG.
Management (12)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Michael Walter Schwander,
Marcel Metzler,
Oscar William Maier,
Marco Baumann,
Chantal Schwander
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.01.1980
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.019.069-5
UID/VAT
CHE-103.993.333
Sector
Fiduciary services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist die Übernahme von Wirtschaftsprüfungs- und Treuhandfunktionen aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bonfida Treuhand AG | St. Gallen | 06.11.2015 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fischer + Partner Treuhand AG Solothurn | Solothurn | 07.02.2011 | 05.11.2015 | |
A. W. Fischer Treuhand AG | Hägendorf | 19.06.2008 | 06.02.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- EG Treuhand AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: MOORE ST. GALLEN AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006137888, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
MOORE ST. GALLEN AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-103.993.333, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 130 vom 07.07.2023, Publ. 1005790093).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schwander, Michael, von Flawil, in Abtwil SG (Gaiserwald), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Maier, Oscar William, von Oberriet (SG), in St. Josefen (Gaiserwald), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Metzler, Marcel, von Niederbüren, in Berg SG, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005790093, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
MOORE ST. GALLEN AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-103.993.333, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 190 vom 30.09.2022, Publ. 1005572874).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ronner-Seger, Marc Oliver, von Schübelbach, in Goldach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005572874, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
MOORE ST. GALLEN AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-103.993.333, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 188 vom 28.09.2022, Publ. 1005570870).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schwander, Michael, von Flawil, in Abtwil SG (Gaiserwald), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Rossrüti (Wil (SG))].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.