Reports for Burki Scherer AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Burki Scherer AG
- Burki Scherer AG has its legal headquarters in Oftringen and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Operation of design, graphics and jewellery studios».
- The management consists of 6 persons. The company was founded on 11.12.1984.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 15.03.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-107.213.023.
Management (6)
newest board members
Stefano Di Giusto,
Jakob Hauser,
Anton Scherer,
Christine Scherer-Steffen
newest authorized signatories
Stefano Di Giusto,
Jakob Hauser,
Chantal Gysler,
Anton Scherer,
Christine Scherer-Steffen
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.12.1984
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oftringen
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.005.851-0
UID/VAT
CHE-107.213.023
Sector
Operation of design, graphics and jewellery studios
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer visuellen Kommunikation; kann Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und verkaufen, sich an Unternehmungen mit gleichem oder ähnlichem Geschäftsbereich beteiligen, solche Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten, Patente, Lizenzen etc. erwerben, verwerten, verwalten und veräussern sowie Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Dr. Balsiger & Partner AG | Zofingen | 22.06.2000 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Burki & Scherer AG
- Burki Repro Technik AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Burki Scherer AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005701148, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Burki Scherer AG, in Oftringen, CHE-107.213.023, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 01.07.2021, Publ. 1005235756).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Di Giusto, Stefano, von Zofingen, in Zofingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: italienischer Staatsangehöriger];
Fanetti, Marco, von Oftringen, in Oftringen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Zofingen].
Publication number: HR02-1005235756, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Burki Scherer AG, in Oftringen, CHE-107.213.023, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 5 vom 09.01.2020, Publ. 1004800366).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der BSO Holding AG, in Oftringen (CHE-107.403.061), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 17.06.2021 und Bilanz per 01.01.2021. Aktiven von CHF 2'207'171.54 - unter welchen Aktien der übernehmenden Gesellschaft enthalten sind - und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 884'011.84 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Da die Aktionäre der übertragenden Gesellschaft die anlässlich der Fusion erworbenen eigenen Aktien der übernehmenden Gesellschaft erhalten, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Publication number: HR02-1004800366, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Burki Scherer AG, in Oftringen, CHE-107.213.023, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 58 vom 25.03.2019, Publ. 1004595046).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bruhin, Roland R., von Schwyz, in Olten, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.