Reports for Basellandschaftliche Pensionskasse
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Basellandschaftliche Pensionskasse
- Basellandschaftliche Pensionskasse in Liestal is a Special legal forms from the sector «Operation of an pension fund». Basellandschaftliche Pensionskasse is active.
- The management of the organization Basellandschaftliche Pensionskasse, which was founded on the 31.10.2006, consists of 14 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 10.04.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BL is CHE-108.905.129.
- organization Basellandschaftliche Pensionskasse has 2 active trademarks, cancelled trademarks or pending applications.
Management (14)
Executive board
Anina Ineichen,
Christoph Raphael Felix,
Fabienne Fritschi,
Lukas Samuel Erb,
Matthias Härri
newest authorized signatories
Anina Ineichen,
Miriam Bucher,
Michael Luttringer,
Tobias Schindelholz,
Stephan Wetterwald
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.10.2006
Legal form
Special legal forms
Legal headquarters of the company
Liestal
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.8.010.146-1
UID/VAT
CHE-108.905.129
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die BLPK hat die Aufgabe, die berufliche Vorsorge der Mitarbeitenden des Kantons und der weiteren, angeschlossenen Arbeitgebenden durchzuführen. Sie erbringt Leistungen gemäss den vom Verwaltungsrat erlassenen Reglementen, in jedem Falle mindestens gemäss den Bestimmungen des Bundesgesetzes über die berufliche Alters-, Hinterlassenen- und Invalidenvorsorge (BVG).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Basel | 11.09.2017 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Basel | 06.11.2006 | 10.09.2017 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
CityGate | 13.02.2003 | active | 09621/2002 |
13.02.2003 | active | 08307/2002 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Basellandschaftliche Pensionskasse
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006005511, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Basellandschaftliche Pensionskasse, in Liestal, CHE-108.905.129, Besondere Rechtsformen (SHAB Nr. 3 vom 05.01.2024, Publ. 1005926276).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Monetti, Thomas, von Oberdorf (BL), in Liestal, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005926276, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Basellandschaftliche Pensionskasse, in Liestal, CHE-108.905.129, Besondere Rechtsformen (SHAB Nr. 246 vom 19.12.2022, Publ. 1005631922).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bammatter, Dr. Michael, von Basel, in Basel, Co-Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lein, Sarah, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Kilchberg (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Dreier, Urs, von Basel, in Forch (Egg), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Tschudin Rosa, Thomas, von Lausen, in Nuglar (Nuglar-St. Pantaleon), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Wäspe, Hansrudolf, von Wattwil, in Büren SO, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bucher, Miriam, von Luzern, in Allschwil, Co-Präsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kübler, Thomas, von Büsserach, in Büsserach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Schindelholz, Tobias, von Arlesheim, in Pfeffingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Erb, Lukas, von Basel, in Liestal, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Felix, Christoph Raphael, von Allschwil, in Therwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Fritschi, Fabienne, von Teufenthal (AG), in Eptingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Härri, Matthias, von Birrwil, in Birrwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Perregaux Bucher, Michèle, von Val-de-Ruz, in Dornach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005631922, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Basellandschaftliche Pensionskasse, in Liestal, CHE-108.905.129, Besondere Rechtsformen (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 01.02.2022, Publ. 1005394381).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Luttringer, Michael, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.