Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Branches (1)
Reports for Assurinvest AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.12.2005
Deletion from the commercial register
22.11.2022
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Eschenbach (SG)
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.058.575-3
UID/VAT
CHE-112.703.899
Sector
Services for insurance and pensions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Pensionskassenberatung und Pensionskassenverwaltung sowie Abschluss von Maklergeschäften in diesem Bereich. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie Grundstücke und Immobilien erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OBT AG, Filiale St. Gallen | St. Gallen | 25.10.2013 | 21.11.2022 | |
Dascon AG | Eschenbach (SG) | 06.01.2006 | 24.10.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
07.11.2019 | active | 03626/2019 | |
12.09.2019 | active | 03624/2019 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Assurinvest AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1005610090, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Assurinvest AG, in Eschenbach (SG), CHE-112.703.899, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 122 vom 27.06.2022, Publ. 1005505371). Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die Assurinvest Advisory AG, neu Assurinvest AG, in Eschenbach (SG) (CHE-112.445.177), über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005505371, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Assurinvest AG, in Eschenbach (SG), CHE-112.703.899, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 01.07.2021, Publ. 1005235653).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gisler-Bamert, Martha, von Tuggen, in Nuolen (Wangen SZ), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005235653, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Assurinvest AG, in Eschenbach (SG), CHE-112.703.899, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 23.06.2021, Publ. 1005226082).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Glaus, Nathalie, von Dübendorf, in Uznach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.